EP1973887 - AZA HETEROCYCLICS FOR THE TREATMENT OF MALARIA OR AIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immupharma France SA Technopole 40 Rue Marc Seguin F-BP 2118 68060 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILLES, Guichard 5, rue du Milieu 67202 Wolfisheim / FR | 02 /
LENA, Gersande Hameau de Vaux 69840 Julienas / FR | 03 /
LALLEMAND, Eliette 5, rue du Poirier Fourrier 95100 Argenteuil / FR | 04 /
RENIA, Laurent Zion Mansion 23 Holland Rik Singapore 287811 / SG | [2012/22] |
Former [2008/40] | 01 /
GILLES, Guichard . . / FR | ||
02 /
LENA, Gersande . . / FR | |||
03 /
LALLEMAND, Eliette . . / FR | |||
04 /
RENIA, Laurent . . / FR | Representative(s) | Bauer, Wulf Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Bauer, Wulf Bauer Vorberg Kayser Patentanwälte Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/31] | Bauer, Wulf Bauer Vorberg Kayser Patentanwälte Lindenallee 43 50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Bauer, Wulf Bauer - Vorberg - Kayser Patentanwälte Lindenallee 43 50968 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 06841645.2 | 28.12.2006 | [2008/40] | WO2006EP70258 | Priority number, date | US20050755631P | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 755631 P | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007074171 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1973887 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1973887 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D255/02, C07D273/02, C07D273/06, C07D285/38, A61K31/395, A61P31/18, A61P33/06 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
C07D255/02 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
C07D273/02 (EP);
C07D273/06 (EP);
C07D285/38 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | AZA-HETEROCYCLEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MALARIA ODER AIDS | [2008/40] | English: | AZA HETEROCYCLICS FOR THE TREATMENT OF MALARIA OR AIDS | [2008/40] | French: | HETEROCYCLES AZA DESTINES AU TRAITEMENT DU PALUDISME OU DU SIDA | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2006 | AT | 19.09.2012 | BE | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | PL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | IE | 28.12.2012 | LU | 28.12.2012 | ES | 30.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IE | 28.12.2012 | ||
LU | 28.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IE | 28.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IE | 28.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9309133 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [X] 1,4 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO9408977 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US]) [A] 1-6* claim 1 *; | [A]WO9502582 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-6 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO0190083 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1,4 * claims 1,3 *; | [X]WO0196318 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [X] 1,4 * claims 14-16 *; | [X]WO0228842 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [PX] - LENA ET AL, "1,3,5-Triazepan-2,6-diones as structurally diverse and conformationally constrained dipeptide mimetics: identification of malaria liver stage inhibitors from a small pilot library", CHEMISTRY--A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (20061115), vol. 12, no. 33, pages 8498 - 8512, XP002424879 [PX] 1-6 * page 8500; examples 4a,4l; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.200600560 |