EP1977748 - COMPOUNDS HAVING NEUROPROTECTIVE PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universidad del Pais Vasco Barrio Sarriena, s/n 48940 Leioa Vizcaya / ES | For all designated states Universidad Pablo de Olavide Carretera de Utrera, Km. 1 41013 Sevilla / ES | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATUTE ALMAU, Carlos Barrio Sarriena, S/n E-48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | 02 /
SÁNCHEZ GÓMEZ, María Victoria Barrio Sarriena, S/n E-48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | 03 /
CAMPOS ESPARZA, Rosario, UPV, Rectorado Barrio Sarriena, S/n E-48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | 04 /
ALBERDI ALFONSO, Elena Barrio Sarriena, S/n E-48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | 05 /
GOTTLIEB, Miroslav Barrio Sarriena, S/n E-48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | 06 /
IBARRETXE BILBAO, Gaskón Barrio Sarriena, S/n E-48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | 07 /
DELGADO GARCÍA, José María Ctra. De Utrera, Km. 1 E-41013 Sevilla / ES | 08 /
GRUART I MASSÓ, Agnès Ctra. De Utrera, Km. 1 E-41013 Sevilla / ES | 09 /
LEAL CAMPANARIO, Rocío Ctra. De Utrera, Km. 1 E-41013 Sevilla / ES | [2009/15] |
Former [2008/41] | 01 /
MATUTE ALMAU, Carlos Barrio Sarriena, S/n E-48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | ||
02 /
SÁNCHEZ GÓMEZ, María Victoria Barrio Sarriena, S/n E-48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | |||
03 /
CAMPOS ESPARZA, Rosario Barrio Sarriena, S/n E-48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | |||
04 /
ALBERDI ALFONSO, Elena Barrio Sarriena, S/n E-48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | |||
05 /
GOTTLIEB, Miroslav Barrio Sarriena, S/n E-48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | |||
06 /
IBARRETXE BILBAO, Gaskón Barrio Sarriena, S/n E-48940 Leioa - Vizcaya / ES | |||
07 /
DELGADO GARCÍA, José María Ctra. De Utrera, Km. 1 E-41013 Sevilla / ES | |||
08 /
GRUART I MASSÓ, Agnès Ctra. De Utrera, Km. 1 E-41013 Sevilla / ES | |||
09 /
LEAL CAMPANARIO, Rocío Ctra. De Utrera, Km. 1 E-41013 Sevilla / ES | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2008/41] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06841779.9 | 29.12.2006 | [2008/41] | WO2006ES00727 | Priority number, date | ES20050003262 | 30.12.2005 Original published format: ES 200503262 | [2008/41] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007077279 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | ES | [2007/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977748 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977748 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/30, A61K31/352 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/352 (EP,ES,US);
A23L33/00 (ES);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | A61K31/352, A23L1/29, A61P25/14, A61P25/16, A61P25/28 | ||
Former IPC [2008/41] | A61K31/352, A23L1/29 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN MIT NEUROPROTEKTIVEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2008/41] | English: | COMPOUNDS HAVING NEUROPROTECTIVE PROPERTIES | [2008/41] | French: | COMPOSES A PROPRIETES NEUROPROTECTRICES | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2008 | Translation filed | 30.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 29.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2006 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | ES | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | IT | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | NL | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IE | 29.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
TR | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IE | 29.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IE | 29.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
IT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
ES | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0149281 (PROTEO TECH INC [US]); | [A]US2003055103 (HEINZEN HORACIO [UY], et al); | [A]JP2005104850 (KANAZAWA UNIV TLO INC, et al); | [XP]WO2006001665 (SEOUL NAT UNIV IND FOUNDATION [KR], et al); | by applicant | JP2005104850 |