EP1957011 - CAGES FOR SETTING AND INTERSOMATICALLY FUSING VERTEBRAE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/34] | CASES FOR SETTING AND INTERSOMATICALLY FUSING VERTEBRAE | ||
[2017/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spineart SA 20 Route de Pré Bois, CP 1813 1217 Meyrin / CH | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVIEUX, Jérôme 324 Route de Lausanne 1293 Bellevue / CH | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/38] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/34] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06841853.2 | 04.12.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006FR02644 | Priority number, date | FR20050012308 | 05.12.2005 Original published format: FR 0512308 | [2008/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007065993 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1957011 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1957011 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
A61F2/4611 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/447 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/2835 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30354 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30364 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/305 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30578 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30593 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30594 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30604 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30777 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/30797 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/4619 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/4627 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/4629 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/38] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE ZUR EINSTELLUNG UND INTERSOMATISCHEN FUSION VON WIRBELN | [2008/34] | English: | CAGES FOR SETTING AND INTERSOMATICALLY FUSING VERTEBRAE | [2017/18] | French: | CAGES DE CONTENTION ET DE FUSION INTERSOMATIQUE DES VERTEBRES | [2008/34] |
Former [2008/34] | CASES FOR SETTING AND INTERSOMATICALLY FUSING VERTEBRAE | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 05.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2006 | AT | 20.09.2017 | CY | 20.09.2017 | CZ | 20.09.2017 | DK | 20.09.2017 | EE | 20.09.2017 | ES | 20.09.2017 | FI | 20.09.2017 | IT | 20.09.2017 | LT | 20.09.2017 | LV | 20.09.2017 | MC | 20.09.2017 | NL | 20.09.2017 | PL | 20.09.2017 | PT | 20.09.2017 | RO | 20.09.2017 | SE | 20.09.2017 | SI | 20.09.2017 | SK | 20.09.2017 | TR | 20.09.2017 | IE | 04.12.2017 | LU | 04.12.2017 | BG | 20.12.2017 | GB | 20.12.2017 | GR | 21.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | IS | 20.01.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 04.12.2006 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
TR | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 04.12.2006 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CY | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.12.2006 | |
AT | 20.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
MC | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SI | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GB | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
DK | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
IT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 20.09.2017 | |
CZ | 20.09.2017 | ||
EE | 20.09.2017 | ||
ES | 20.09.2017 | ||
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
PL | 20.09.2017 | ||
RO | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
SK | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
IS | 20.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 20.09.2017 | |
FI | 20.09.2017 | ||
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
NL | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
LV | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
BG | 20.12.2017 | ||
GR | 21.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
SE | 20.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 20.09.2017 | |
LT | 20.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 20.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004193269 (FRASER ROBERT [AT], et al) [A] 1-8,11 * figures 1-4; claims 1,9,27-29 * * paragraphs [0026] , [0033] *; | [A]US2005065605 (JACKSON ROGER P [US]) [A] 1,5-8,11 * figures 1,13-17 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] , [0044] , [0045] *; | [A]US5423816 (LIN CHIH I [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2-4 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 11 *; | [A]WO03005938 (OSTEOTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 11,12,15-18 * * page 16, paragraph 2 *; | [A]EP1374809 (RAZIAN HASSAN [FR]) [A] 1,3 * figure - * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021] *; | [A]US5683394 (RINNER JAMES A [US]) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 18 - line 65 *; | [A]EP1470803 (SEPITEC FOUNDATION [LI]) | by applicant | US2004193269 |