EP1964282 - TRANSMITTING ANTENNA SYSTEM, METHOD AND PROGRAM THAT CAN ADAPT TO PROPAGATION CONDITIONS FOR RADIO BROADCASTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/36] | TRANSMITTING ANTENNA SYSTEMS THAT CAN ADAPT TO PROPAGATION CONDITIONS FOR RADIO BROADCASTING | ||
[2016/51] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDF 10, rue d'Oradour-sur-Glane 75015 Paris / FR | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIOLE, Philippe 32 rue de la Rabine F-35510 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | 02 /
JEZEQUEL, Pierre-Yves 5 rue du Soleil Levant F-35235 Thorigne Fouillard / FR | 03 /
* * * | [2009/09] |
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
PIOLE, Philippe 32 rue de la Rabine F-35510 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | ||
02 /
JEZEQUEL, Pierre-Yves 5 rue du Soleil Levant F-35235 Thorigne Fouillard / FR | |||
03 /
JACQUIN, François 2 rue du Verger F-35000 Rennes / FR | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès 9 rue St Antoine du T 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Bringer, Mathieu, et al GEVERS FRANCE 9, rue Saint Antoine du T 31000 Toulouse / FR | ||
Former [2013/50] | Bringer, Mathieu, et al GEVERS FRANCE 81 Boulevard Lazare Carnot, e6 31000 Toulouse / FR | ||
Former [2008/36] | Lapoux, Roland Cabinet Bloch & Gevers 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06842003.3 | 06.11.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006FR51142 | Priority number, date | FR20050053486 | 17.11.2005 Original published format: FR 0553486 | [2008/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007057591 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1964282 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/02 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
H04B7/02 (EP,US);
H04W16/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Title | German: | SENDEANTENNENSYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAM, DIE SICH FÜR DIE FUNKAUSSTRAHLUNG AN AUSBREITUNGSBEDINGUNGEN ANPASSEN KÖNNEN | [2016/51] | English: | TRANSMITTING ANTENNA SYSTEM, METHOD AND PROGRAM THAT CAN ADAPT TO PROPAGATION CONDITIONS FOR RADIO BROADCASTING | [2016/51] | French: | PROCEDE, PROGRAMME ET SYSTEME D'ANTENNES D'EMISSION ADAPTATIVES AUX CONDITIONS DE PROPAGATION POUR DIFFUSION RADIOELECTRIQUE | [2016/51] |
Former [2008/36] | SENDEANTENNENSYSTEME, DIE SICH FÜR DIE FUNKAUSSTRAHLUNG AN AUSBREITUNGSBEDINGUNGEN ANPASSEN KÖNNEN | ||
Former [2008/36] | TRANSMITTING ANTENNA SYSTEMS THAT CAN ADAPT TO PROPAGATION CONDITIONS FOR RADIO BROADCASTING | ||
Former [2008/36] | SYSTEMES D'ANTENNES D'EMISSION ADAPTATIVES AUX CONDITIONS DE PROPAGATION POUR DIFFUSION RADIOELECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 11.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/41] | 24.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y] - EVANS J B ET AL, "THE RAPIDLY DEPLOYABLE RADIO NETWORK", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199904), vol. 17, no. 4, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 689 - 703, XP000824312 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * page 690; figure 1 * * page 691, column 2, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.761045 | [Y] - MOHAMMED A ET AL, "Evaluation of the Bluetooth Link and Antennas Performance for Indoor Office Environments by Measurement Trials and FEMLAB Simulations", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2005. VTC 2005-SPRING. 2005 IEEE 61ST STOCKHOLM, SWEDEN 30-01 MAY 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050530), ISBN 0-7803-8887-9, pages 238 - 242, XP010855389 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * page 238, column 2, paragraph 4 * * page 240, column 1, paragraph 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2005.1543286 | [Y] - ALTMAN Z ET AL, "OaSys: FTR&D UMTS automatic cell planning tool", IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM. 2002 DIGEST. APS. SAN ANTONIO, TX, JUNE 16 - 21, 2002, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020616), VOL. 1 OF 4, ISBN 0-7803-7330-8, pages 338 - 341, XP010591923 [Y] 1-13 * page 338, paragraph 5 - paragraph L * * page 339, lines 7,8 * * page 339, paragraph LAST - page 340, paragraph LAST * * page 339; figure 2 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APS.2002.1016317 |