EP1963923 - ANALYSIS DEVICE WITH AN ARRAY OF FOCUSING MICROSTRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/08] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIRKSEN, Peter c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
AKSENOV, Yuri c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VAN DEN HEUVEL, Fredericus, C. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
KWINTEN, Johannes, A., J., M. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/08] |
Former [2008/36] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06842551.1 | 15.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006IB54882 | Priority number, date | EP20050112195 | 15.12.2005 Original published format: EP 05112195 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007069222 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1963923 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1963923 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, G01N21/01, B01L3/00, G03F9/00 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
G03F7/70616 (EP,US);
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
G03F7/70608 (EP,US);
G03F9/7011 (EP,US);
G03F9/7019 (EP,US);
G03F9/7076 (EP,US);
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G11C16/16 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALYSEEINRICHTUNG MIT EINEM ARRAY VON FOKUSSIERUNGSMIKROSTRUKTUREN | [2008/36] | English: | ANALYSIS DEVICE WITH AN ARRAY OF FOCUSING MICROSTRUCTURES | [2008/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF D' ANALYSE AVEC UNE MATRICE DE MICROSTRUCTURES DE MISE AU POINT | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 14.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2006 | AT | 21.02.2018 | CY | 21.02.2018 | CZ | 21.02.2018 | DK | 21.02.2018 | EE | 21.02.2018 | ES | 21.02.2018 | FI | 21.02.2018 | IT | 21.02.2018 | LT | 21.02.2018 | LV | 21.02.2018 | MC | 21.02.2018 | NL | 21.02.2018 | PL | 21.02.2018 | PT | 21.02.2018 | RO | 21.02.2018 | SE | 21.02.2018 | SI | 21.02.2018 | SK | 21.02.2018 | TR | 21.02.2018 | BG | 21.05.2018 | GR | 22.05.2018 | IS | 21.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.12.2006 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4416826 (SCHULZE STEFFEN DIPL ING [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 11-20 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0800075 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-8,11 * column 5, lines 38-56 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0998977 (GRIFOLS GRUPO SA [ES]) [A] 1-8,11 * column 2, lines 21-23 * * figure 4 *; | [X]US6585939 (DAPPRICH JOHANNES [US]) [X] 1-8,11 * column 3, lines 44-55 * * column 4, lines 4-12 * * column 12, lines 22-31,47-61 * * figure 9 *; | [X]JP2004333654 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-7 * abstract *; | [X]US6953695 (LANGOWSKI JORG [DE]) [X] 1-8,11 * column 1, lines 47-51 * * column 2, lines 19-30 * * figures 1,2 *; | [E]WO2007069221 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [E] 1-8,11* the whole document * | Examination | EP1263098 | US2005286597 | by applicant | DE4416826 | EP0800075 | EP0998977 | US6585939 | JP2004333654 | US6953695 |