EP1967345 - MOLDED FOAM ARTICLE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING MOLDED FOAM ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | [2019/32] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAGUCHI, Yasuhiro c/o Tokuyama Sekisui Co., Ltd., 4560, Kaiseicho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi;7460006 / JP | 02 /
SAWA, Takashi c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd., 2-1, Hyakuyama, Sh imamotocho, Mishima-gun Osaka 6188589 / JP | [2019/32] |
Former [2008/37] | 01 /
KAWAGUCHI, Yasuhiro c/o Tokuyama Sekisui Co., Ltd., 4560, Kaiseicho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi;7460006 / JP | ||
02 /
SAWA, Takashi c/o Sekisui Chemical Co., Ltd., 2-1, Hyakuyama, Sh imamotocho, Mishima-gun Osaka 6188589 / JP | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2008/37] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06843182.4 | 25.12.2006 | [2008/37] | WO2006JP325779 | Priority number, date | JP20050376362 | 27.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005376362 | JP20060338993 | 15.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006338993 | [2008/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007074773 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967345 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1967345 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/00, C08J9/32, B29K105/04, B29C44/58 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
B29C44/586 (EP,US);
B29C45/00 (KR);
C08J9/32 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2105/04 (KR);
C08J2203/22 (EP,US);
Y10T428/268 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/37] | B29C45/00, C08J9/32, B29K105/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2019/32] |
Former [2009/04] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMKÖRPER AUS SCHAUMSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FORMKÖRPERS AUS SCHAUMSTOFF | [2008/37] | English: | MOLDED FOAM ARTICLE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING MOLDED FOAM ARTICLE | [2008/37] | French: | ARTICLE EN MOUSSE MOULÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D UN ARTICLE EN MOUSSE MOULÉ | [2008/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2008 | Translation filed | 03.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 29.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.02.2009 | Observations by third parties | 31.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 25.12.2019 | [2020/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09234758 (NIPPON FUIRAITO KK) [Y] 2-5 * paragraphs [0012] - [0016] - [0024] - [0040] - [0043] *; | [Y]US6010656 (NOMURA MANABU [JP], et al) [Y] 2-5 * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 65 *; | [Y]DE10005862 (MOELLER PLAST GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2-5 * column 1, lines 1-7 * * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 51 * * column 3, lines 2-56 *; | [Y]US2003015815 (MCCLELLAND ALAN NIGEL [BE], et al) [Y] 2-5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0014] , [0035] - [0037] - [0043] , [0046] - [0049]; figure 1 *; | [XA]JP2003246382 (SUMIKA PLASTECH CO LTD, et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-5; | [Y]EP1577359 (MATSUMOTO YUSHI SEIYAKU KK [JP]) [Y] 2-5* paragraphs [0001] , [0017] , [0032] - [0039] - [0065] , [0066]; table 1 * | Examination | JP2001191355 | JP2002283382 | other | JPH0780885 | JPH09234758 | JP2002283382 | GB2395719 | EP1508604 | JP2005153217 | JP2006002133 | JP2008156590 | - YASUHIRO KAWAGUCHI ET AL, "Heat-resisting expandable microspheres utilizing interactions between methacrylic acid and metallic salts", KOBUNSHI RONBUNSHU, (200501), vol. 62, no. 1, pages 36 - 43, XP003023337 |