EP1972253 - ENCAPSULATED MEDICAL DEVICE GUIDING SYSTEM AND ITS CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIYAMA, Akio c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | 02 /
KIMURA, Atsushi c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | 03 /
AOKI, Isao c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | [2008/50] |
Former [2008/39] | 01 /
UCHIYAMA, Akio c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | ||
02 /
KIMURA, Atushi c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | |||
03 /
AOKI, Isao c/o Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3 Kuboyama-cho, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | von Hellfeld, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06843528.8 | 27.12.2006 | [2008/39] | WO2006JP326146 | Priority number, date | JP20050376277 | 27.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005376277 | [2008/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007077896 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1972253 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
A61B1/041 (EP,US);
A61B1/00158 (EP,US);
A61B34/70 (EP,US);
A61B34/73 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/04] |
Former [2008/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKAPSELTES MEDIZINPRODUKT-FÜHRUNGSSYSTEM UND KONTROLLVERFAHREN | [2008/39] | English: | ENCAPSULATED MEDICAL DEVICE GUIDING SYSTEM AND ITS CONTROL METHOD | [2008/39] | French: | SYSTEME DE GUIDAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF MEDICAL ENCAPSULE ET SON PROCEDE DE COMMANDE | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2008 | Translation filed | 23.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 29.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 27.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/50] | Divisional application(s) | EP10014249.6 / EP2335559 | EP11004808.9 / EP2384687 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5681260 (UEDA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-2* description of figure 44 viz. embodiment 19;; figure 44 *; | [Y]US2002188174 (AIZAWA CHIEKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-2 * paragraph [0548]; figure 69 *; | [Y]JP2003260026 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [Y] 1-2 * claim 1 * |