EP1938663 - APPARATUS FOR ENCODING AND DECODING AUDIO SIGNAL AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANG, Hee Suk 101, 14-10, Yangjae-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-130 / KR | 02 /
OH, Hyeon O 306-403, Gangseon Maeul 3-danji Apt. Juyeop 1(il)-dong, Ilsan-gu, Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 151-057 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Dong Soo 1502, Woorim Villa, 602-265, Namhyeon-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-801 / KR | 04 /
LIM, Jae Hyun 609, Parkvill Officetel, 1062-20, Namhyeon-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-801 / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Yang Won 2-803, Yeoksam Hanshin Apt., Dogok-dong Kangnam-gu Seoul 135-270 / KR | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Katérle, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/27] | Katérle, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06843794.6 | 30.08.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006KR03423 | Priority number, date | US20050712119P | 30.08.2005 Original published format: US 712119 P | US20050719202P | 22.09.2005 Original published format: US 719202 P | US20050723007P | 04.10.2005 Original published format: US 723007 P | US20050726228P | 14.10.2005 Original published format: US 726228 P | US20050729225P | 24.10.2005 Original published format: US 729225 P | KR20060004051 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: KR 20060004051 | KR20060004057 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: KR 20060004057 | KR20060004062 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: KR 20060004062 | KR20060004063 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: KR 20060004063 | KR20060004055 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: KR 20060004055 | KR20060004065 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: KR 20060004065 | US20060762536P | 27.01.2006 Original published format: US 762536 P | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007055462 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1938663 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 18.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
G10L19/167 (EP,US);
G10L19/008 (EP,US);
H04S1/007 (EP,US);
H04R2499/11 (EP,US);
H04S2420/03 (EP,US);
H04S3/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/27] | H04S3/00, G10L19/00, G10L19/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR KODIERUNG UND DEKODIERUNG EINES AUDIOSIGNALS UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/27] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ENCODING AND DECODING AUDIO SIGNAL AND METHOD THEREOF | [2008/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR CODER ET DECODER UN SIGNAL AUDIO ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 10.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.03.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2017 | 19.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/13] | 23.11.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/13] | Appeal following examination | 02.05.2016 | Appeal received | 05.07.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.10.2016 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SCHUIJERS E ET AL, "LOW COMPLEXITY PARAMETRIC STEREO CODING", PREPRINTS OF PAPERS PRESENTED AT THE AES CONVENTION, XX, XX, (20040508), no. 6073, pages 1 - 11, XP008047510 [A] 1-20 * figure 6 * * paragraphs [03.5] , [03.6] * | [A] - HERRE J ET AL, "THE REFERENCE MODEL ARCHITECTURE FOR MPEG SPATIAL AUDIO CODING", AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY CONVENTION PAPER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20050528), pages 1 - 13, XP009059973 [A] 1-20 * paragraph [4.7.1] * * paragraph [4.10] * | International search | [X]US5481643 (TEN KATE WARNER R T [NL], et al); | [X]US5682461 (SILZLE ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [X]US6021386 (DAVIS MARK FRANKLIN [US], et al); | [X]US2003195742 (TSUSHIMA MINEO [JP], et al); | [X] - HAMDY K.N. ET AL., "Low bit rate high quality audio coding with combined harmonic and wavelet representations", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1996. ICASSP-96. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, (19960507), pages 1045 - 1048, XP003011834 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1996.543542 | [X] - WEBB J. ET AL., "Video and audio coding for mobile applications", WEBB J. ET AL., GATHERE A. AND AUSLANDER E., The application of programmable DSPs in mobile communications, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD., (2002), pages 179 - 200, ISBN 0-471-48643-4, XP003011835 | [X] - BOLTZE T. ET AL., "Audio services and applications", BOLTZE T. ET AL., HOEG W. AND LAUTERBACH T., Digital Audio Broadcasting, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD., (2003), pages 75 - 125, ISBN 0-470-85013-2, XP003011836 | [X] - FALLER C., "Parametric coding of spatial audio", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DIGITAL AUDIO EFFECTS (DAFX'04). INVITED PAPER. NAPLES, ITALY, (20041005), pages 151 - 156, XP002367850 | Examination | - "WD 2 for MPEG Surround", 73. MPEG MEETING;25-07-2005 - 29-07-2005; POZNAN; (MOTION PICTUREEXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20050729), no. N7387, ISSN 0000-0345, XP030013965 | - HEE-SUK PANG ET AL, "Proposed Syntax Revision for Redundancy Reduction in MPEG Surround", 74. MPEG MEETING; 17-10-2005 - 21-10-2005; NICE; (MOTION PICTUREEXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20051013), no. M12550, ISSN 0000-0243, XP030041220 |