EP1931792 - TRANSGENIC ALOE PLANTS FOR PRODUCTION OF PROTEINS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TheGreenCell, Inc. 7909 Tilbury Street Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOWTHER, William, J. 510 Constitution Avenue NE Washington, DC 20002 / US | 02 /
YEOW, Wen-Shuz 37 South 20th Street, Apartment 1B Philadelphia PA 19103 / US | 03 /
LORICK, Kevin 3002 Findley Road Kensington, MD 20895 / US | 04 /
PAGES, Marisol Abraham Lincoln Avenue 1021 Santo Domingo / DO | 05 /
LOWTER, Nicola, J 314 Capitol Street NE, Apartment 204 Washington, DC 20003 / US | [2008/33] |
Former [2008/25] | 01 /
LOWTHER, William, J. 510 Constitution Avenue NE Washington, DC 20002 / US | ||
02 /
YEOW, Wen-Shuz 3 Pooks Hill, Apartment 111 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | |||
03 /
LORICK, Kevin 3002 Findley Road Kensington, MD 20895 / US | |||
04 /
PAGES, Marisol Abraham Lincoln Avenue 1021 Santo Domingo / DO | |||
05 /
LOWTER, Nicola, J 314 Capitol Street NE, Apartment 204 Washington, DC 20003 / US | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06844187.2 | 26.09.2006 | [2008/25] | WO2006US37756 | Priority number, date | US20050720540P | 26.09.2005 Original published format: US 720540 P | [2008/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007035966 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1931792 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1931792 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
C12N15/8257 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSGENE ALOE-PFLANZEN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON PROTEINEN UND ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN | [2008/25] | English: | TRANSGENIC ALOE PLANTS FOR PRODUCTION OF PROTEINS AND RELATED METHODS | [2008/25] | French: | ALOES TRANSGENIQUES UTILES DANS LA PRODUCTION DE PROTEINES ET PROCEDES CORRESPONDANTS | [2008/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 27.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 27.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.07.2010 | CZ | 14.07.2010 | EE | 14.07.2010 | LT | 14.07.2010 | LV | 14.07.2010 | PL | 14.07.2010 | RO | 14.07.2010 | SI | 14.07.2010 | SK | 14.07.2010 | TR | 14.07.2010 | IE | 26.09.2010 | LU | 26.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | BG | 14.10.2010 | GR | 15.10.2010 | IS | 14.11.2010 | PT | 15.11.2010 | HU | 15.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 26.09.2010 | ||
LU | 26.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
HU | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 26.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
HU | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 26.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0155433 (UNIV ALBERTA [CA], et al) [Y] 3 * Page 7 line 24 - Page 8 line 9 *; | [Y]WO0238780 (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR], et al) [Y] 3* Page 10 lines 5-19 Page 10 line 21 - Page 11 line 13 *; | [X]US2003059486 (BAILEY MARY L [US]) [X] 1 * Claims 1-6 Abstract *; | [X] - SINNOTT R A, "AGRICULTURAL BIOTECHNOLOGY: GENETIC ENGINEERING OF SUNFLOWER AND ALOE WITH VIRULENT STRAINS OF AGROBACTERIUM", DISSERTATION, XX, XX, (199512), page 148PP, XP009083568 [X] 1,2 * Abstract Pages 54-75 * |