EP1968416 - DRYING STORAGE RACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helen of Troy Limited 13 8th Avenue Belleville P.O. Box 836E St. Michael / BB | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SULLIVAN, Ann 211 Temple Road Waltham, MA 02452 / US | 02 /
CAMERON, Allan 1 Edson Road Natick, MA 01760 / US | 03 /
MCDERMOTT, Patrick, F. 13 Foster Street Oxford, MA 01540 / US | 04 /
GREGORY, Paul 5 Appleton Dr Watertown, Massachusetts 02465 / US | 05 /
ROHATGI, Guerav 46 Dale Street Franklin, MA 02038 / US | 06 /
TRAINA, Zach 74 East Street Himgham, MA 02043 / US | 07 /
DIPIETRO, Dean 885 Park Avenue, 2A Brooklyn, NY 11206 / US | [2008/50] |
Former [2008/38] | 01 /
SULLIVAN, Ann 211 Temple Road Waltham, MA 02452 / US | ||
02 /
CAMERON, Allan 1 Edson Road Natick, MA 01760 / US | |||
03 /
MCDERMOTT, Patrick, F. 13 Foster Street Oxford, MA 01540 / US | |||
04 /
GREGORY, Paul 18 Laurel Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | |||
05 /
ROHATGI, Guerav 46 Dale Street Franklin, MA 02038 / US | |||
06 /
TRAINA, Zach 74 East Street Himgham, MA 02043 / US | |||
07 /
DIPIETRO, Dean 885 Park Avenue, 2A Brooklyn, NY 11206 / US | Representative(s) | Heyer, Volker, et al Bockhorni & Kollegen Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Heyer, Volker, et al Bockhorni & Kollegen Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06845332.3 | 13.12.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006US47504 | Priority number, date | US20050302301 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: US 302301 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007070557 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1968416 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A47G19/08 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
A47L19/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TROCKENLAGERGESTELL | [2008/38] | English: | DRYING STORAGE RACK | [2008/38] | French: | CASIER DE RANGEMENT POUR SECHAGE | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/49] | 20.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2708037 (PLANETA PAUL H); | [Y]US6763954 (TRAVERS JOHN F [US], et al); | [Y]US4854537 (WELCH BARRY P [US]); | [Y]US5794797 (KUNTZ WILLIAM [US]); | [Y]US4531641 (ARCHAMBAULT GENE [US]); | [Y]US1487942 (HINES EDWIN G, et al); | [Y]US2516088 (GEORGE EINHORN); | [Y]US2002185166 (ROSENBAUER MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [Y]US5431294 (STOTTMANN RICHARD L [US], et al) |