EP1964281 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR COMMUNICATING AND/OR USING TRANSMISSION POWER INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAS, Arnab 15 Walnut Street Summit, NJ 07901 / US | 02 /
RANGAN, Sundeep c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2015/11] |
Former [2008/42] | 01 /
DAS, Arnab 15 Walnut Street Summit, NJ 07901 / US | ||
02 /
RANGAN, Sundeep. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 - 1714 / US | |||
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
DAS, Arnab 15 Walnut Street Summit, NJ 07901 / US | ||
02 /
RANGAN, Sundeep 228 Montgomery Street Apt. 8 Jersey City, NJ 07302 / US | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2008/36] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06845858.7 | 20.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006US48506 | Priority number, date | US20050752973P | 22.12.2005 Original published format: US 752973 P | US20060333771 | 17.01.2006 Original published format: US 333771 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007075731 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1964281 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1964281 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/16, H04W52/14, H04W52/36, H04W24/10, H04W52/54, H04B17/24 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
H04W52/146 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/005 (CN);
H04B17/24 (KR,US);
H04W24/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/02 (KR);
H04W52/04 (CN);
H04W52/08 (CN);
H04W52/16 (KR,US);
H04W52/365 (EP,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/38 (KR);
H04W52/40 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2015/05] | H04B17/00, H04W24/10, H04W52/14, H04W52/16, H04W52/36, H04W52/54 | ||
Former IPC [2008/36] | H04B7/005 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KOMMUNIKATION UND/ODER ÜBERTRAGUNG VON ENERGIEINFORMATION | [2008/36] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR COMMUNICATING AND/OR USING TRANSMISSION POWER INFORMATION | [2008/36] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION ET/OU D'UTILISATION DE DONNEES DE PUISSANCE DE TRANSMISSION | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 17.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15176109.5 / EP2958382 | EP19197507.7 / EP3605856 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2006 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BE | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | SE | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IE | 20.12.2015 | LU | 20.12.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IE | 20.12.2015 | ||
LU | 20.12.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IE | 20.12.2015 | ||
LU | 20.12.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IE | 20.12.2015 | ||
LU | 20.12.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
LU | 20.12.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
LU | 20.12.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1054518 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1,28 * page 2, paragraph 11 - paragraph 12 * * page 3, paragraph 25 - page 4, paragraph 28 * * page 6, paragraph 46 - paragraph 48 * * figures 4-6 *; | [A]US2003114180 (BLACK PETER J [US], et al) [A] 1,28 * page 1, paragraph 7 * * page 3, paragraph 33 - paragraph 35 * * page 4, paragraph 49 * * page 5, paragraph 56 - paragraph 58 *; | [A]EP1594260 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1,28 * column 7, paragraph 32 - column 8, paragraph 38 ** claim 1 * |