EP1958112 - AUTOMATED BOX OPENING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cornerstone Automation System, Inc. 300 West Broadway 10 Prosper, TX 75078 / US | For all designated states Robotica, Inc. 7303 Dayhill Drive Spring, TX 77379 / US | [2014/35] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Cornerstone Automation System, Inc. 300 West Broadway 10 Prosper, TX 75078 / US | ||
For all designated states Robotica, Inc. 9307 Katie Grace Circle Spring, TX 77379 / US | |||
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Cornerstone Automation System, Inc. 300 West Broadway 10 Prosper, TX 75078 / US | ||
For all designated states Robotica, Inc. 9307 Katie Grace Circle Spring, TX 77379 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUGAT, Jay 9307 Katie Grace Circle Spring, TX 77379 / US | 02 /
DOKE, Michael, J. 636 Creekview Drive Prosper, TX 75078 / US | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06846513.7 | 07.12.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006US61729 | Priority number, date | US20050164909 | 09.12.2005 Original published format: US 164909 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007067947 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1958112 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958112 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00, B26D1/04, B25J9/00, // B26D1/62 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
B65B69/0033 (EP,US);
B25J11/0055 (EP,US);
B25J9/0093 (EP,US);
B26D1/04 (EP,US);
B26D1/0006 (EP,US);
B26D2001/0033 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/34] | G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE BEHÄLTERÖFFNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/34] | English: | AUTOMATED BOX OPENING APPARATUS | [2008/34] | French: | APPAREIL AUTOMATIQUE D'OUVERTURE DE BOÎTE | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 27.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12003450.9 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 05.06.2012 | EP12003451.7 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 05.06.2012 | EP12003452.5 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 05.06.2012 | EP12003453.3 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 05.06.2012 | EP12003454.1 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 05.06.2012 | EP12003458.2 / EP2527263 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 04.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 04.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2006 | AT | 30.04.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | CY | 30.04.2014 | CZ | 30.04.2014 | DK | 30.04.2014 | EE | 30.04.2014 | ES | 30.04.2014 | FI | 30.04.2014 | IT | 30.04.2014 | LT | 30.04.2014 | LV | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | NL | 30.04.2014 | PL | 30.04.2014 | RO | 30.04.2014 | SE | 30.04.2014 | SI | 30.04.2014 | SK | 30.04.2014 | TR | 30.04.2014 | BG | 30.07.2014 | GR | 31.07.2014 | IS | 30.08.2014 | PT | 01.09.2014 | LU | 07.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2249516 (YOUNG MICHAEL CHARLES) [A] 6 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0845440 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4,5 * abstract *; | [Y]DE19724040 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * column 2, lines 59-65 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2000343486 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP) [Y] 4,5,7 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002002636 (MAEJIMA KOGYO KK) [A] 3* abstract *; | [X]EP1329388 (BAT CIGARETTENFAB GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0010] *; | [XY]US6694852 (OURS DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,18 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5,7; | [A]DE20314281U (HEIDEL GMBH & CO KG WERKZEUG U [DE]) [A] 6 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US6694852 (OURS DAVID C [US], et al); | [Y]US2001001516 (HARDGROVE WILLIAM H [US], et al); | [Y]US2004194428 (CLOSE DONALD R [US], et al); | [Y]US2006074525 (CLOSE ERIC [US], et al) | [Y] - HMC PRODUCTS, INC, "Case cutter boasts productivity at distribution center", URL: http://www.casecutter.com/main.html, XP008132934 | Examination | JP2003081228 | by applicant | JP2003081228 |