EP2081527 - WOUND CARE PRODUCT MADE FROM BULKED FILAMENT TOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celanese Acetate LLC 1601 West LBJ Freeway Dallas, TX 75234 / US | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NERON, Rene B. 3510 Evergreen Trail Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | 02 /
ROBERTSON, Raymond M. 3210 Gordon Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | 03 /
SUTHAR, Jitendrakumar N. 305 Ascot Lane Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | 04 /
DEHART, Gary E. Route 2 Box 451 Peterstown, WV 24693 / US | [2014/12] |
Former [2009/31] | 01 /
NERON, Rene B. 3510 Evergreen Trail Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | ||
02 /
ROBERTSON, Raymond M. 3210 Gordon Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | |||
03 /
SUTHAR, Jitendrakumar N. 305 Ascot Lane Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | |||
04 /
DEHART, Gary E. Route 2 Box 451 Peterstown, WV 24693 / US | Representative(s) | Braun, André jr. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Braun, André jr. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2009/31] | Braun, André jr. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 06846525.1 | 08.12.2006 | [2009/31] | WO2006US61770 | Priority number, date | US20060559507 | 14.11.2006 Original published format: US 559507 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008060306 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2081527 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2081527 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00, D02J1/18, D04H3/14, A61F13/02 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
A61F13/0203 (EP,CN,US);
A61L15/22 (KR);
A61F13/01021 (US);
A61F13/00 (KR);
A61F13/02 (KR);
A61F13/15 (KR);
D02J1/18 (EP,CN,US);
D04H3/14 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2013/00748 (EP,CN,US);
Y10T442/608 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/31] | A61F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | WUNDPFLEGEPRODUKT AUS GEBAUSCHTEN FASERSEIL | [2009/31] | English: | WOUND CARE PRODUCT MADE FROM BULKED FILAMENT TOW | [2009/31] | French: | PRODUIT POUR LE SOIN DES BLESSURES FABRIQUÉ À PARTIR D'UN CÂBLE DE FILAMENTS TEXTURÉS | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 20.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP14160425.6 / EP2767266 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2006 | AT | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | CZ | 19.03.2014 | DK | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | ES | 19.03.2014 | FI | 19.03.2014 | IT | 19.03.2014 | LT | 19.03.2014 | LV | 19.03.2014 | MC | 19.03.2014 | NL | 19.03.2014 | PL | 19.03.2014 | RO | 19.03.2014 | SE | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SK | 19.03.2014 | BG | 19.06.2014 | GR | 20.06.2014 | IS | 19.07.2014 | PT | 21.07.2014 | IE | 08.12.2014 | LU | 08.12.2014 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 08.12.2006 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
TR | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.12.2006 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 08.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 08.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
IT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
ES | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
NL | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
LV | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3499810 (WAGLE DINKAR GANPAT) [X] 1-15 * column 7, line 34 - column 8, line 60 *; | [I]WO2004035902 (BARTH GEORG MARTIN [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 2 *; | [I]WO2004035901 (BARTH GEORG MARTIN [DE], et al) [I] 1-15* page 4, paragraph 2 * | International search | [Y]US3322606 (RICHARD KOLLER CHARLES); | [Y]US4021281 (PALL DAVID B); | [Y]US2002120244 (SAWYER LAWRENCE HOWELL [US], et al); | [X]US2005186879 (MARTIN KENNETH E [US]); | [Y]US2005215962 (LITVAY JOHN [US], et al) |