EP1969499 - MEDIA LIBRARY IN AN INTERACTIVE MEDIA GUIDANCE APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2160 Gold Street San Jose, CA 95002 / US | [2018/01] |
Former [2017/16] | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2 Circle Star Way San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | ||
Former [2015/37] | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | ||
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states United Video Properties, Inc. 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states United Video Properties, Inc. 6922 Hollywood Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90028 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMAS, William, L. 8475 S Quemoy St. Aurora, Co 80016 / US | 02 /
WALKER, Todd, A. 77 Highpoint Drive Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US | [2021/14] |
Former [2008/43] | 01 /
THOMAS, William, L. 12 Broad Leaf Trail Malvern, Pennsylvania 19355 / US | ||
02 /
WALKER, Todd, A. 77 Highpoint Drive Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US | |||
Former [2008/38] | 01 /
THOMAS, William, L. 11611 South 70th East Avenue Bixby, OK 74008 / US | ||
02 /
WALKER, Todd, A. 11126 South 70th East Avenue Bixby, OK 74008 / US | Representative(s) | Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street GB-London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06847579.7 | 12.12.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006US47430 | Priority number, date | US20050323906 | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 323906 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007078745 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1969499 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
H04N21/47202 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/7867 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/4828 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Title | German: | MEDIENBIBLIOTHEK IN EINER INTERAKTIVEN MEDIENANLEITUNGSANWENDUNG | [2008/38] | English: | MEDIA LIBRARY IN AN INTERACTIVE MEDIA GUIDANCE APPLICATION | [2008/38] | French: | BIBLIOTHÈQUE MULTIMÉDIA DANS UNE APPLICATION DE GUIDAGE MULTIMÉDIA INTERACTIVE | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 31.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.01.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/52] | 22.11.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/52] | Appeal following examination | 01.03.2019 | Appeal received No. T1414/19 | 01.05.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.11.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | 22.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP18186408.3 / EP3418920 | EP24163483.1 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 05.07.2012 | [2012/36] | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002035697 (MCCURDY KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0141] - paragraph [0156] * * figure 7 *; | [A]US2003172005 (HELLAL FATEN FAY [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004025180 (BEGEJA LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0081] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2004096184 (POSLINSKI THOMAS [US]) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005015405 (PLASTINA DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract ** paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] *; | [X] - SUSANNE BOLL, UTZ WESTERMANN, "Meeting experience: MediÆther: an event space for context-aware multimedia experiences", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2003 ACM SIGMM WORKSHOP ON EXPERIENTIAL TELEPRESENCE ETP '03, Berkeley, California, ISBN 1-58113-775-3, (20031107), pages 21 - 30, URL: http://delivery.acm.org/10.1145/990000/982488/p21-boll.pdf?key1=982488&key2=9969139711&coll=portal&dl=ACM&CFID=2181828&CFTOKEN=68827537, (20070516), XP002434278 [X] 1-25 * the whole document * | Examination | US2004133923 | US2004268386 |