EP1968574 - USE OF BENZO-FUSED HETEROCYCLE SULFAMIDE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF OBESITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2011/32] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica, N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH-SWINTOSKY, Virginia L. 3163 Line Lexington Road Hatfield, Pennsylvania 19440 / US | 02 /
REITZ, Allen B. 109 Greenbriar Road Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Warner, James Alexander, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Warner, James Alexander, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 -45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06847860.1 | 19.12.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006US48681 | Priority number, date | US20050751499P | 19.12.2005 Original published format: US 751499 P | US20060611938 | 18.12.2006 Original published format: US 611938 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007075833 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1968574 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1968574 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1968574 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/353, A61K31/357, A61P3/04 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
A61K31/353 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/357 (EP,KR,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Extension states | AL | 18.07.2008 | BA | 18.07.2008 | HR | 18.07.2008 | MK | 18.07.2008 | RS | 18.07.2008 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BENZOKONDENSIERTEN HETEROCYCLISCHEN SULFAMID-DERIVATEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ADIPOSITAS | [2008/38] | English: | USE OF BENZO-FUSED HETEROCYCLE SULFAMIDE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT OF OBESITY | [2008/38] | French: | UTILISATION DE DERIVES DE SULFAMIDE HETEROCYCLIQUE BENZO-FUSIONNE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'OBESITE | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 12.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 31.12.2010 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 12.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2011 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 23.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9719682 (SYNAPTIC PHARMA CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-10* claim 16 *; | [Y]WO0207821 (SOLVAY PHARM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004073037 (JONES A BRIAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-17 *; | [Y] - SCOZZAFAVA A ET AL, "Modulation of carbonic anhydrase activity and its applications in therapy", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS 2004 UNITED KINGDOM, (2004), vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 667 - 702, XP002431413 [Y] 1-10 * page 690, column R - page 692, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.14.5.667 | [Y] - MARYANOFF B E ET AL, "Comparison of sulfamate and sulfamide groups for the inhibition of carbonic anhydrase-II by using topiramate as a structural platform", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY 24 MAR 2005 UNITED STATES, (20050324), vol. 48, no. 6, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1941 - 1947, XP002431411 [Y] 1-10 * compounds 15, 17 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm040124c |