EP1968457 - DEVICES FOR PLACEMENT OF PARTITIONS WITHIN A HOLLOW BODY ORGAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/38] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PLACEMENT OF PARTITIONS WITHIN A HOLLOW BODY ORGAN | ||
[2012/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2011/19] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Satiety, Inc. 2470 Embarcadero Way Palo Alto, CA 94303-3313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELLER, Gary 15570 El Gato Lane Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | 02 /
ROTH, Alex T. 1354 Regent Street Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 03 /
JULIAN, Christopher 546 Woodland Ridge Los Gatos, CA 95033 / US | 04 /
GANNOE, James 85 Green Terrace Way West Milford, NJ 07480 / US | 05 /
HANCOCK, Andrew H. 40231 Hacienda Court Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 06 /
GERBI, Craig 445 Purisima Way Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | 07 /
LEE, Crystine M. 38 Museum Way San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | [2009/08] |
Former [2008/38] | 01 /
WELLER, Gary 15570 El Gato Lane Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | ||
02 /
ROTH, Alex T. 1354 Regent Street Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | |||
03 /
JULIAN, Christopher 546 Woodland Ridge Los Gatos, CA 95033 / US | |||
04 /
GANNOE, James 85 Green Terrace Way West Milford, NJ 07480 / US | |||
05 /
HANCOCK, Andrew H. 40231 Hacienda Court Fremont, CA 94539 / US | |||
06 /
GERBI, Craig 515 Villa Street Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | |||
07 /
LEE, Crystine M. 38 Museum Way San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2011/27] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2008/38] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06847913.8 | 22.12.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006US48779 | Priority number, date | US20050324135 | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 324135 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007078988 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1968457 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1968457 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/02, A61B17/29 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B17/0218 (EP,US);
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B90/92 (EP,US);
A61F5/0086 (EP,US);
A61B17/105 (EP,US);
A61B17/3474 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/003 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00557 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07214 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07221 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07271 (EP,US);
A61B2017/306 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0811 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/38] | A61B17/072, A61F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR PLATZIERUNG VON TRENNWÄNDEN IN EINEM HOHLEN KÖRPERORGAN | [2012/51] | English: | DEVICES FOR PLACEMENT OF PARTITIONS WITHIN A HOLLOW BODY ORGAN | [2012/51] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE PLACEMENT DE CLOISONS DANS UN ORGANE CREUX DU CORPS | [2012/51] |
Former [2008/38] | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR PLATZIERUNG VON TRENNWÄNDEN IN EINEM HOHLEN KÖRPERORGAN | ||
Former [2008/38] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PLACEMENT OF PARTITIONS WITHIN A HOLLOW BODY ORGAN | ||
Former [2008/38] | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCEDES DE PLACEMENT DE CLOISONS DANS UN ORGANE CREUX DU CORPS | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 06.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11166248.2 / EP2382926 | EP11166292.0 / EP2382927 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2006 | AT | 24.04.2013 | BE | 24.04.2013 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | LT | 24.04.2013 | LV | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | PL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | TR | 24.04.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | ES | 04.08.2013 | IS | 24.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | IE | 22.12.2013 | LU | 22.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
TR | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
BE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
PT | 26.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0373762 (ETHICON INC [US]) [Y] 1-5,7-11 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0539125 (ETHICON INC [US]) [Y] 2,3,7 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9600030 (KIETURAKIS MACIEJ J [US]) [Y] 2,3,7 * abstract *; | [A]US2002183768 (DEEM MARK E [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * paragraphs [0103] - [0107]; figures 9b,10,11A,12C,34A *; | [Y]US2003192937 (SULLIVAN ROY H [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-11 * figures 1,3A,13,27,28 *; | [A]US2005038462 (LUBOCK PAUL [US], et al) [A] 2* figure 8A *; | [DY]US2005080438 (WELLER GARY [US], et al) [DY] 10,11 * figures 9a,9y *; | [Y]WO2005092210 (SATIEY INC [US]) [Y] 1-5,7-11 * the whole document * | Examination | US2005096673 | by applicant | US4610383 | US6558400 | US2003192937 | US6773440 | US2005192599 | US2005192601 | WO2005092210 | US2005256533 | US7097650 | US7175638 |