EP2079972 - REFRIGERATION UNIT WITH INTEGRATED STRUCTURAL CONDENSER COIL SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation Carrier World Headquarters One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Carrier Corporation Carrier World Headquarters One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STONE, Dennis, M. 5687 Stevens Drive Cicero, NY 13039 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, Thomas, A. 11785 State Route 176 Cato, NY 13033 / US | 03 /
SCARCELLA, Jason 8334 Angler's Club Cicero, NY 13039 / US | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/30] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06847941.9 | 22.12.2006 | [2009/30] | WO2006US48841 | Priority number, date | US20060851370P | 13.10.2006 Original published format: US 851370 P | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008045113 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2079972 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F25D19/00, // B65D88/74, F28F9/013, B65D88/12 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
F25D19/003 (EP,US);
B65D88/121 (EP,US);
B65D88/74 (EP,US);
F28F9/013 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/30] | F25D19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | KÜHLEINHEIT MIT INTEGRIERTEM STRUKTURELLEN KONDENSATORSPULENTRÄGER | [2009/30] | English: | REFRIGERATION UNIT WITH INTEGRATED STRUCTURAL CONDENSER COIL SUPPORT | [2009/30] | French: | UNITÉ DE RÉFRIGÉRATION COMPRENANT UN SUPPORT DE SERPENTIN DE CONDENSEUR STRUCTUREL INTÉGRÉ | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 09.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/33] | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3733849 (CANTAGALLO R, et al) [I] 1-6 * abstract *; | [I]JPH0694343 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [I] 1-6* abstract * | International search | [X]US3733849 (CANTAGALLO R, et al); | [Y]US2005241327 (DADDIS EUGENE D JR [US], et al); | [Y]US4189123 (JOHNSON BERNARD L [US]) | Examination | EP2079967 | by applicant | US3733849 |