EP1996931 - BLOOD CELL SORTING METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAUSTMAN, Denise L. 180 Beacon Street Boston, MA 02493 / US | 02 /
BURGER, Douglas E. 41 Davis Road Stoughton, MA 02072 / US | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/49] | 01 /
FAUSTMAN, Denise L. 74 Pinecroft Road Weston, MA 02493 / US | ||
02 /
BURGER, Douglas E. 41 Davis Road Stoughton, MA 02072 / US | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [2013/48] |
Former [2008/49] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight BusinessTowers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06848249.6 | 28.12.2006 | [2008/49] | WO2006US49437 | Priority number, date | US20050754426P | 28.12.2005 Original published format: US 754426 P | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007079149 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1996931 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1996931 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00, G01N33/48 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
C12N5/0087 (EP,US);
C12N13/00 (EP,US);
C12N5/0634 (EP,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
Y10T436/10 (EP,US);
Y10T436/101666 (EP,US);
Y10T436/108331 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25125 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLUTZELLEN-SORTIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEME | [2008/49] | English: | BLOOD CELL SORTING METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2008/49] | French: | PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES DE TRI DE GLOBULES SANGUINS | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 10.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.12.2006 | AT | 27.11.2013 | BE | 27.11.2013 | BG | 27.11.2013 | CY | 27.11.2013 | CZ | 27.11.2013 | EE | 27.11.2013 | ES | 27.11.2013 | FI | 27.11.2013 | LT | 27.11.2013 | LV | 27.11.2013 | MC | 27.11.2013 | PL | 27.11.2013 | RO | 27.11.2013 | SI | 27.11.2013 | SK | 27.11.2013 | TR | 27.11.2013 | IE | 28.12.2013 | LU | 28.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | GR | 28.02.2014 | IS | 27.03.2014 | PT | 27.03.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/38] | HU | 28.12.2006 | |
AT | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
GR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 28.12.2013 | ||
LU | 28.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 28.12.2006 | |
AT | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 28.12.2013 | ||
LU | 28.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 28.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 28.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IE | 28.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 27.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9919730 (COULTER INT CORP [US]); | International search | [X]US5260192 (RUSSELL THOMAS [US], et al); | [Y]US5411863 (MILTENYI STEFAN [DE]) |