EP1974013 - IMPROVED COMPOSITION FOR COLLECTING AND PRESERVING PLACENTAL STEM CELLS AND METHODS OF USING THE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anthrogenesis Corporation 7 Powder Horn Drive Warren, NJ 07059 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | For all designated states Anthrogenesis Corporation 7 Powder Horn Drive Warren NJ 07059 / US | ||
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Anthrogenesis Corporation Hanover Technical Center 45, Horsehill Road Cedar Knolls, NJ 07927 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDINGER, James, W. 273 Leonardville Road Belford, NJ 07718 / US | 02 /
HEIDARAN, Mohamad 88 Ormont Road Chatham, NJ / US | 03 /
HOFGARTNER, Wolfgang 89 Brooklake Road A Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | [2008/44] |
Former [2008/40] | 01 /
EDINGER, James, W. 273 Leonardville Road Belford, NJ 07718 / US | ||
02 /
HEIDARAN, Mohamad 88 Ormont Road Chatham, NJ / US | |||
03 /
HOFGARTNER, Wolfgang 11 Dellwood Road White Plains, NY 10605 / US | Representative(s) | Weber, Martin, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Weber-Quitzau, Martin, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Hermann, Bettina Celia Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06848282.7 | 28.12.2006 | [2008/40] | WO2006US49493 | Priority number, date | US20050754969P | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 754969 P | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007079185 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1974013 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
C12N5/0605 (EP,US);
C12N5/0607 (KR);
C12N5/00 (KR);
C12N2501/48 (EP,US);
C12N2501/999 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Extension states | AL | 07.07.2008 | BA | 07.07.2008 | HR | 07.07.2008 | MK | 07.07.2008 | RS | 07.07.2008 | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUM SAMMELN UND ZUR KONSERVIERUNG VON PLAZENTASTAMMZELLEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2008/40] | English: | IMPROVED COMPOSITION FOR COLLECTING AND PRESERVING PLACENTAL STEM CELLS AND METHODS OF USING THE COMPOSITION | [2008/40] | French: | COMPOSITION AMÉLIORÉE POUR LA COLLECTE ET LA CONSERVATION DE CELLULES SOUCHES PLACENTAIRES ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION DE CETTE COMPOSITION | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 20.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 06.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02064755 (ANTHROGENESIS CORP [US]) [X] 1,6,14,1,6,14,1,6,14,1,6,14 * pages 10-11 * * pages 14-15 * * page 19 *; | [A] - SHI J ET AL, "BAX and caspase activity limit adult neural stem cell persistence.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACT VIEWER AND ITINERARY PLANNER, & 33RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY OF NEUROSCIENCE; NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA; NOVEMBER 08-12, 2003, (2003), vol. 2003, pages Abstract No. 356.7 URL - http://sf, XP002445312 [A] 1,2,6,14 * the whole document * | [A] - PELLEGRINI MARC ET AL, "FADD and caspase-8 are required for cytokine-induced proliferation of hemopoietic progenitor cells", BLOOD, (200509), vol. 106, no. 5, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1581 - 1589, XP002445313 [A] 1,2,6,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2005-01-0284 | [A] - LINDBERG EVA HELLSTROM ET AL, "Apoptosis in refractory anaemia with ringed sideroblasts is initiated at the stem cell level and associated with increased activation of caspases", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, (200103), vol. 112, no. 3, ISSN 0007-1048, pages 714 - 726, XP002445314 [A] 1,2,6,14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2141.2001.02581.x | [A] - WIESMANN ANNE ET AL, "No reduction of TGF-beta induced apoptosis on hematopoietic stem and progenitor cells in vitro by caspase inhibitors", BLOOD, & 43RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, PART 2; ORLANDO, FLORIDA, USA; DECEMBER 07-11, 2001, (20011116), vol. 98, no. 11 Part 2, ISSN 0006-4971, page 141b, XP002445315 [A] 1,2,6,14 * the whole document * |