EP1972161 - A method and apparatus for routing emergency calls in a VoIP system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/39] | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ROUTING EMERGENCY CALLS IN A VOIP SYSTEM | ||
[2010/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): RO | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOEBAUM, Leland, Scott 103 Creekbury Court Cary, NC 27519 / US | 02 /
HOMILLER, Daniel 202 Bebington Drive Cary, NC 27513 / US | 03 /
CAMP, William, Jr. 400 North Boundary Street Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06848305.6 | 28.12.2006 | [2008/39] | WO2006US49527 | Priority number, date | US20060755926P | 03.01.2006 Original published format: US 755926 P | US20060608554 | 08.12.2006 Original published format: US 608554 | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007081574 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1972161 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1972161 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/22, H04W64/00, H04W88/06 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
H04M3/42357 (EP,US);
H04M3/5116 (EP,US);
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
H04W76/50 (EP,US);
H04M2207/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/39] | H04Q7/32, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, RO [2009/06] |
Former [2008/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Routen von Notrufen in einem VoIP-System | [2010/21] | English: | A method and apparatus for routing emergency calls in a VoIP system | [2010/21] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'acheminement d'appels d'urgence dans un système VoIP | [2010/21] |
Former [2008/39] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ROUTEN VON NOTRUFEN IN EINEM VOIP-SYSTEM | ||
Former [2008/39] | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ROUTING EMERGENCY CALLS IN A VOIP SYSTEM | ||
Former [2008/39] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ACHEMINEMENT D'APPELS D'URGENCE DANS UN SYSTÈME VOIP | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 04.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.10.2010 | RO | 13.10.2010 | [2011/42] |
Former [2011/30] | NL | 13.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2005213716 (ZHU YINJUN [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-13,15-17 * page 1, paragraph 15 - paragraph 16 * * page 3, paragraph 39 - page 4, paragraph 73 * [Y] 7,14,18; | [Y]WO2005112488 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al) [Y] 7,14,18* page 12, paragraph 67 - page 13, paragraph 72 * |