EP1957520 - POLYVALENT CHIMERIC OSPC VACCINOGEN AND DIAGNOSTIC ANTIGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH UNIVERSITY 800 E. Leigh Street, Suite 113 Richmond, VA 23219 / US | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCONI, Richard, Thomas 13718 Hickory Nut Point Midlothian, VA 23112 / US | 02 /
EARNHART, Christopher 12 Harbin Court Williamsburg, VA 23185 / US | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Kröncke, Rolf, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13 a 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Kröncke, Rolf, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Freundallee 13 a D-30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 06848500.2 | 29.11.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006US61327 | Priority number, date | US20050740272P | 29.11.2005 Original published format: US 740272 P | US20060789588P | 06.04.2006 Original published format: US 789588 P | US20060790530P | 10.04.2006 Original published format: US 790530 P | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007065098 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1957520 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/20, A61K39/02, C07K16/12 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/20 (EP,US);
A61K39/0225 (US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/34] | C07K14/195, A61K39/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Extension states | AL | 20.06.2008 | BA | 20.06.2008 | HR | 20.06.2008 | MK | 20.06.2008 | RS | 20.06.2008 | Title | German: | POLYVALENTES CHIMÄRISCHES OSPC-VACCINOGEN UND DIAGNOSTISCHES ANTIGEN | [2008/34] | English: | POLYVALENT CHIMERIC OSPC VACCINOGEN AND DIAGNOSTIC ANTIGEN | [2008/34] | French: | ANTIGENE OSPC CHIMERE POLYVALENT VACCINOGENE ET DIAGNOSTIQUE | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 20.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/07] | 30.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.07.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.2011 | 30.11.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0078966 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US], et al); | [Y]US6872550 (LIVEY IAN [AT], et al); |