EP1963431 - THERMOPLASTIC POLYCARBONATE COMPOSITIONS WITH LOW GLOSS, ARTICLES MADE THEREFROM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRISHNAMURTHY, Raja 406, Vars Fantasy 1st Main Kodihalli Hal Iind Stage Bangalore, Karnataka 560008 / IN | 02 /
TOTAD, Rajashekhar, Shiddappa 7/47, 1st Main, Laxmisaga Layout Mahadeyapura Post Bangalore Karnataka 560048 / IN | 03 /
TYAGI, Sandeep B-011, Millennium Habitat Kundalahalli, Bangalore Karnataka 560037 / IN | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06848607.5 | 07.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006US46762 | Priority number, date | US20050302939 | 14.12.2005 Original published format: US 302939 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007070352 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1963431 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00, C08L33/00 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
C08L69/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L33/00 (KR);
C08L33/06 (KR);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/0884 (EP,US);
C08L25/12 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L69/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE POLYCARBONATZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT SCHWACHEM GLANZ, DARAUS HERGESTELLTE ARTIKEL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/36] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC POLYCARBONATE COMPOSITIONS WITH LOW GLOSS, ARTICLES MADE THEREFROM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | [2008/36] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYCARBONATE THERMOPLASTIQUE AYANT UN FAIBLE BRILLANT, ARTICLES FABRIQUES A PARTIR DE CELLES-CI ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 02.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 10.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03097743 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-8,10-24 * example -; claims 1,2; table - *; | [X]EP0677555 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * examples 1,2 *; | [X]NL9200616 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1-6,9-20,23,24 * examples 3,5 *; | [X]US5223573 (KURUGANTI VIJAYA K [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-19,23,24 * examples 1-3,5,9-11,13-15; tables I,II,IV,V * |