EP1971903 - BEVERAGE DISPENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DD Operations Ltd. 106 Mount Street London W1K 2TW / GB | [2020/41] |
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states Digitaldispense USA, LLC One Commerce Center 1201 Orange Street, Suite 600 Wilmington, DE 19899 / US | ||
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states Niagara Dispensing Technologies, Inc. 170 North Pointe Parkway Suite 500 Amherst NY 14228 / US | ||
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Niagara Dispensing Technologies, Inc. 199 Fire Tower Drive Tonawanda NY 14150 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHALLEN, Iver, J. 583 Lake Road Youngstown, NY 14174 / US | 02 /
VOGT, Douglas 33 Blackmon Road Grand Island, NY 14072 / US | 03 /
GAGLIANO, Thomas Localita La Caletta 11 I-57033 Marciana Marina (LI) / IT | 04 /
HIGNER, Kirk, D. 344 Tremont Avenue Kenmore, NY 14217 / US | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2020/44] |
Former [2013/37] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/02] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/39] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06848785.9 | 15.12.2006 | [2008/39] | WO2006US62203 | Priority number, date | US20050751167P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 751167 P | US20050751120P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 751120 P | US20060795825P | 28.04.2006 Original published format: US 795825 P | US20060795824P | 28.04.2006 Original published format: US 795824 P | US20060795823P | 28.04.2006 Original published format: US 795823 P | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007076309 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1971903 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1971903 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/14, B67D1/12, G05D7/06 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
B67D1/1234 (EP,US);
B67D1/0857 (US);
B67D1/0888 (US);
B67D1/124 (EP,US);
B67D1/1243 (EP,US);
B67D1/127 (EP,US);
B67D1/1272 (EP,US);
B67D1/1411 (EP,US);
F16K27/003 (EP,US);
F16K7/045 (EP,US);
F16K7/06 (EP,US);
F17C13/04 (US);
G05D7/0647 (EP,US);
G05D7/0652 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7761 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/39] | G05D7/06, B67D1/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2008/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGABE VON GETRÄNKEN | [2008/39] | English: | BEVERAGE DISPENSING | [2008/39] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE BOISSON | [2008/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 20.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/23] | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/36] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/07] | 10.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Public notification(s) | Noting of loss of rights pursuant to Rule 112(1) EPC (EPO Form 2561 16.05.2012) Sent to Niagara Dispensing Technologies, Inc. 199 Fire Tower Drive, Tonawanda NY 14150 U.S.A | Niagara Dispensing Technologies, Inc. 199 Fire Tower Drive Tonawanda NY 14150 / US | [2012/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.04.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 01.04.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to appoint a representative | 28.05.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 28.05.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2014 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 28.06.2013 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2009 | 31.12.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2013 | 31.12.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2006 | AT | 28.10.2020 | CY | 28.10.2020 | CZ | 28.10.2020 | DK | 28.10.2020 | EE | 28.10.2020 | ES | 28.10.2020 | FI | 28.10.2020 | IT | 28.10.2020 | LT | 28.10.2020 | LV | 28.10.2020 | MC | 28.10.2020 | NL | 28.10.2020 | PL | 28.10.2020 | RO | 28.10.2020 | SI | 28.10.2020 | SK | 28.10.2020 | TR | 28.10.2020 | LU | 15.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | BG | 28.01.2021 | GR | 29.01.2021 | IS | 28.02.2021 | PT | 01.03.2021 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
TR | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
LU | 15.12.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 28.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB649146 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO) [Y] 1-7,15-19,38-40,49,58,64-66,74,126 * page 3, line 64 - line 136; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9831935 (PHALLEN IVER J [US], et al) [A] 1-7,15-19,38-40,49,58,64-66,74,126* figures 5,13,14,21-23 *; | [Y]EP1099661 (NIAGARA PUMP CORP [US]) [Y] 1-7,15-19,38-40,49,58,64-66,74,126 * figures 9-13,32 * * paragraphs [0060] - [0062] * * paragraphs [0108] - [0112] *; | [A]US2004177893 (YOUNKLE MATTHEW C [US]) [A] 1-7,15-19,38-40,49,58,64-66,74,126 * the whole document *; | [PX]GB2415763 (DIAGEO IRELAND [IE]) [PX] 1,4,5,38,40,58,64-66,70,74,126 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * pages 1,6 * |