EP1933626 - SEED SUSPENSIONS FROM "LUPINUS ALBUS", ISOLATED COMPOUNDS THEREOF AND USE AS BIOLOGICAL PLANT STRENGTHENING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AgrarForum AG Poststrasse 1 29699 Bomlitz / DE | For all designated states AgrarForum SA (PTY) Ltd. P.O. Box 11669 Universitas 9321 / ZA | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Benz, Jürgen Kanzlei Heumann, Benz Spessartring 63 64287 Darmstadt / DE | [2015/35] |
Former [2008/26] | Benz, Jürgen Kanzlei Heumann, Benz, Spessartring 63 64287 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 06849380.8 | 02.09.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006EP08586 | Priority number, date | EP20050019323 | 06.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05019323 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007090438 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1933626 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1933626 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01N65/00, A01N65/20, A01N37/06, A01N37/12, C05F11/00, A01P21/00, // A01N65/40 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
C05F11/10 (EP);
A01N37/06 (EP);
A01N37/12 (EP);
A01N65/00 (EP);
A01N65/20 (EP);
A01N65/40 (EP);
A01N65/42 (EP);
C05G3/60 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP);
Y02W30/40 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N65/00, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N65/00, A01N37/12, A01N65/00, A01N65/00 (EP);
A01N65/20, A01N25/12, A01N37/12, A01N65/00, A01N65/20, A01N65/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/26] | A01N65/00, A01N37/06, A01N37/12, C05F11/00, A01P21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2008/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAMEN SUSPENSIONEN AUS LUPINUS ALBUS, ISOLIERTE VERBINDUNGEN DARAUS UND DIE VERWENDUNG AS BIOLOGISCHES PFLANZENSTÄRKUNGSMITTEL | [2015/16] | English: | SEED SUSPENSIONS FROM "LUPINUS ALBUS", ISOLATED COMPOUNDS THEREOF AND USE AS BIOLOGICAL PLANT STRENGTHENING AGENT | [2008/26] | French: | SUSPENSIONS DE GRAINES DE "LUPINUS ALBUS", COMPOSES ISOLES DE CELLES-CI ET UTILISATION COMME AGENT BIOLOGIQUE DE RENFORCEMENT DE VEGETAUX | [2008/26] |
Former [2008/26] | SAMENSUSPENSIONEN AUS LUPINUS ALBUS, ISOLIERTE VERBINDUNGEN DARAUS UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS BIOLOGISCHER PFLANZENSTÄRKUNGSWIRKSTOFF | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2006 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BE | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | ES | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | GR | 26.08.2015 | IT | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | NL | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | SE | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | IE | 02.09.2015 | LU | 02.09.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 02.09.2006 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
GR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 02.09.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 02.09.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 02.09.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IE | 02.09.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
IT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NL | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
ES | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
SE | 26.08.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9938379 (POLUS HORST [DE], et al) [DY] 1-27 * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 13 * * page 10, line 12 - page 11, line 17 * * page 12, line 24 - page 13, line 24 * * page 15, line 20 - page 16, line 15 *; | [YX]EP0775443 (MITTEX ANLAGENBAU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-27 * column 1, lines 28-49 * * column 2, lines 7-34 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 7 * [X] 8-12; | [Y]WO8300419 (MITTEX AG [LI]) [Y] 1-27 * page 2, lines 5-9 * * page 5, lines 6-33 * * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 32 *; | [X]WO2004018069 (NEUMUELLER WALDEMAR [DE]) [X] 8-12 * page 4, line 23 - page 6, line 12 * * page 6, lines 24-31 * * page 7, lines 8-21; example 1 *; | [Y]GB230203 (WILHELM SCHMITZ) [Y] 13 * page 1, lines 43-56; examples A,B * * page 2, lines 13-25 *; | [X]WO9118508 (SOSTRA S R L [IT]) [X] 11,12 * page 3, lines 11-18 * * page 7, lines 11-20; table 1 * | [Y] - KAHNT G ET AL, "USE OF LUPINEX TO INCREASE CROP YIELD AND IMPROVE HARVEST QUALITY WITH LESSER NITROGEN FERTILIZATION", JOURNAL OF AGRONOMY AND CROP SCIENCE, BERLIN, DE, (1991), vol. 166, ISSN 0931-2250, pages 228 - 237, XP002046313 [Y] 1-27 * page 229, column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 2 * * Part IV 'Discussion' * |