EP1960754 - NON-INVASIVE GAS MONITORING FOR MANUFACTURED MULTIPLE PANED GLASS UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gas Sensors Solutions Limited The Invent Centre, Dublin City University, Collins Avenue Glasnevin Dublin 9 / IE | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUCKIAN, Adrian 20 The Court Lutterell Hall Dunboyne Co. Meath / IE | 02 /
DYSON, Maja 16 Cedar Drive Millfarm Dunboyne Co. Meath / IE | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06849536.5 | 12.12.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006IB04203 | Priority number, date | US20050749415P | 12.12.2005 Original published format: US 749415 P | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007099407 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1960754 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/20, G01N21/64 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
G01N21/643 (EP,US);
E06B3/677 (EP,US);
G01M3/20 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6432 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTINVASIVE GASÜBERWACHUNG FÜR GEFERTIGTE GLASEINHEITEN MIT MEHREREN SCHEIBEN | [2008/35] | English: | NON-INVASIVE GAS MONITORING FOR MANUFACTURED MULTIPLE PANED GLASS UNITS | [2008/35] | French: | DETECTION NON-INVASIVE DE GAZ POUR DES ENSEMBLES EN VERRE A VITRES MULTIPLES | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/36] | 20.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4848138 (MARSHALL JOHN M [US]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 1, lines 6-36 *; | [X]US5030420 (BACON JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 1, lines 11-15 * * column 6, lines 37-39 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 12 * * column 12, lines 24-42 * * column 13, lines 23-31,63-68 * * column 15, lines 9-15,20-24,29-41 * * figure 5 *; | [XA]WO0067014 (UPM KYMMENE CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 8, columns 7-19 * * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 6 * [A] 11; | [A]WO0246740 (HOAGLAND BILL [US]) [A] 3,11* page 8, lines 10-20 * |