EP1952641 - VIDEO COMPRESSION ENCODER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertiv IT Systems, Inc. 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2019/06] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Avocent Corporation 4991 Corporate Drive Huntsville, AL 35805 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMBRACKAS, William A. 3040 Birkdale Weston, FL 33332-1810 / US | 02 /
COSTA, Mario 124 SW 180th Avenue Pembroke Pines, FL 33029 / US | 03 /
GOODLEY, George Richard 900 SE 5th Court Pompano Beach, FL 33060 / US | [2019/33] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
DAMBRACKAS, William, A. 3040 Birkdale Weston, FL 33332-1810 / US | ||
02 /
COSTA, Mario 124 SW 180th Avenue Pembroke Pines, FL 33029 / US | |||
03 /
GOODLEY, George, Richard 900 SE 5th Court Pompano Beach, FL 33060 / US | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2020/01] |
Former [2008/32] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06849789.0 | 30.05.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006US21182 | Priority number, date | US20050282688 | 21.11.2005 Original published format: US 282688 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007097773 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1952641 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1952641 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/507, H04N19/426 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
H04N19/507 (EP,US);
H04N19/426 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/47] | H04N11/04, H04N11/02, H04N7/12, H04B1/66, H04N7/26, H04N7/36, H04N7/34 | ||
Former IPC [2008/32] | H04N11/04, H04N11/02, H04N7/12, H04B1/66 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB [2020/01] |
Former [2009/23] | BE, DE, GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VIDEOKOMPRESSIONSKODIERER | [2019/32] | English: | VIDEO COMPRESSION ENCODER | [2008/32] | French: | CODEUR DE COMPRESSION VIDEO | [2008/32] |
Former [2008/32] | VIDEOKOPRESSIONKODIERER | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.05.2020 | [2021/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2318956 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [I] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 10 * * page 7, line 14 - page 11, line 17 * * page 16, line 4 - page 17, line 1 * * figures 2A, 2B, 3A-E * * claim 25 *; | [I] - GOLDBERG M ET AL, "IMAGE SEQUENCE CODING USING VECTOR QUANTIZATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ. USA, (19860701), vol. COM-34, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TCOM.1986.1096600, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 703 - 710, XP002280029 [I] 1 * abstract * * sections I and III.A * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1986.1096600 | [I] - CAGNAZZO M ET AL, "Low-complexity scalable video coding through table lookup VQ and index coding", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE/COMPUTATIONAL SCIENCE (CPAIOR 2011), SPRINGER, DE, (20020101), doi:10.1007/3-540-36166-9_15, ISBN 978-3-540-24128-7, pages 166 - 175, XP002324381 [I] 1 * abstract * * sections 2 and 3.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-36166-9_15 | International search | [Y]US4142243 (BISHOP RICHARD L, et al); | [A]US4369464 (TEMIME JEAN-PIERRE [FR]); | [Y]US5864681 (PROCTOR JOHN J [US], et al); | [Y]US2005069034 (DAMBRACKAS WILLIAM A [US]); | [A]US2005089091 (KIM CHANG-SU [KR], et al); | [Y] - CHRYSAFIS ET AL., "Line-Based, Reduced Memory, Wavelet Image Compression", (200003), URL: http://www.sipl.usc.edu/~ortega/Students/chrysafi/doc/ChristosChrysafis_line_based_IP2000.pdf, XP011025538 |