EP1902329 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PASSIVELY ESTIMATING ANGLE AND RANGE OF A SOURCE USING SIGNAL SAMPLES COLLECTED SIMULATANEOUSLY FROM A MULTI-APERTURE ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451-1449 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham Massachusetts 02451-1449 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOBER, Michael B. 13289 N. Regulation Dr. Oro Valley, AZ 85755-6875 / US | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/13] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06849791.6 | 05.06.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006US21756 | Priority number, date | US20050152291 | 13.06.2005 Original published format: US 152291 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007092034 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1902329 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1902329 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/48, G01S11/04 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
G01S11/04 (EP,US);
G01S3/48 (EP,US);
G01S5/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/13] | G01S13/14, G01S11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR PASSIVEN SCHÄTZUNG DES WINKELS UND DES BEREICHS EINER QUELLE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SIGNALPROBEN, DIE GLEICHZEITIG VON EINER ANTENNE MIT MEHREREN ÖFFNUNGEN GESAMMELT WURDEN | [2008/13] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PASSIVELY ESTIMATING ANGLE AND RANGE OF A SOURCE USING SIGNAL SAMPLES COLLECTED SIMULATANEOUSLY FROM A MULTI-APERTURE ANTENNA | [2008/13] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION PASSIVE D'ANGLE ET DE PLAGE DE SOURCE À L'AIDE D'ÉCHANTILLONS DE SIGNAUX COLLECTÉS SIMULTANÉMENT À PARTIR D'UNE ANTENNE À OUVERTURES MULTIPLES | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2006 | AT | 13.02.2013 | BE | 13.02.2013 | CY | 13.02.2013 | CZ | 13.02.2013 | DK | 13.02.2013 | EE | 13.02.2013 | FI | 13.02.2013 | IT | 13.02.2013 | LT | 13.02.2013 | LV | 13.02.2013 | MC | 13.02.2013 | NL | 13.02.2013 | PL | 13.02.2013 | RO | 13.02.2013 | SE | 13.02.2013 | SI | 13.02.2013 | SK | 13.02.2013 | TR | 13.02.2013 | BG | 13.05.2013 | GR | 14.05.2013 | ES | 24.05.2013 | IE | 05.06.2013 | LU | 05.06.2013 | IS | 13.06.2013 | PT | 13.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
TR | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IE | 05.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IE | 05.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IE | 05.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA] - ABED-MERAIM K ET AL, "A Linear Prediction-like Algorithm For Passive Localization Of Near-field Sources", INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SIGNAL PROCESSING AND ITS APPLICATIONS, ISSPA, GOLD COAST, AUSTRALIA, (19960825), vol. 2, pages 626 - 629, XP010241088 [X] 1,5 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6-10 | [XA] - ABED-MERAIM K ET AL, "Second-order near-field source localization: algorithm and performance analysis", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, 1996. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE THIRTIETH ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON PACIFIC GROVE, CA, USA 3-6 NOV. 1996, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19961103), vol. 1, ISBN 0-8186-7646-9, pages 723 - 727, XP010231523 [X] 1,5 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.1996.601144 | [XA] - GROSICKI E ET AL, "A weighted linear prediction method for near-field source localization", 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP). ORLANDO, FL, MAY 13 - 17, 2002, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020513), VOL. 4 OF 4, ISBN 0-7803-7402-9, pages III - 2957, XP010804016 [X] 1,5 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6-10 |