EP1966492 - FLUID TRANSFER CONTROLLERS HAVING A ROTOR ASSEMBLY WITH MULTIPLE SETS OF ROTOR BLADES ARRANGED IN PROXIMITY AND ABOUT THE SAME HUB COMPONENT AND FURTHER HAVING BARRIER COMPONENTS CONFIGURED TO FORM PASSAGES FOR ROUTING FLUID THROUGH THE MULTIPLE SETS OF ROTOR BLADES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Macro-Micro Devices, Inc. 901 Main Street, Suite 4110 Dallas TX 75202 / US | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABDALLAH, Shaaban, A. 10694 Bramblewood Cr. Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Hendry, Niall James, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2013/45] |
Former [2009/48] | Feakins, Graham Allan, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2008/52] | Feakins, Graham Allan, et al Raworth Moss & Cook Raworth House 36 Sydenham Road GB-Croydon, Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | ||
Former [2008/37] | Feakins, Graham Allan Raworth Moss & Cook Raworth House 36 Sydenham Road GB-Croydon, Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 06850259.0 | 11.12.2006 | [2008/37] | WO2006US61838 | Priority number, date | US20050322100 | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 322100 | [2008/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007100405 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1966492 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04D25/04, F04D29/28, F04D17/12, F04D29/42 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
F04D25/045 (EP,US);
F04D17/12 (EP,US);
F04D29/286 (EP,US);
F04D29/4206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Title | German: | FLUIDÜBERTRAGUNGS-STEUERGERÄTE MIT EINER ROTORBAUGRUPPE MIT MEHREREN SÄTZEN VON IN DER NÄHE UND OBERHALB DER SELBEN HUB-KOMPONENTE ANGEORDNETEN ROTORBLÄTTERN SOWIE MIT ZUR FORMUNG VON DURCHGÄNGEN ZUR LEITUNG DES FLUIDS DURCH DIE MEHREREN SÄTZE VON ROTORBLÄTTERN KONFIGURIERTEN SPERRTEILEN | [2008/37] | English: | FLUID TRANSFER CONTROLLERS HAVING A ROTOR ASSEMBLY WITH MULTIPLE SETS OF ROTOR BLADES ARRANGED IN PROXIMITY AND ABOUT THE SAME HUB COMPONENT AND FURTHER HAVING BARRIER COMPONENTS CONFIGURED TO FORM PASSAGES FOR ROUTING FLUID THROUGH THE MULTIPLE SETS OF ROTOR BLADES | [2008/37] | French: | REGULATEURS DE TRANSFERT DE FLUIDE MUNIS D'UN ENSEMBLE ROTOR COMPORTANT DES JEUX MULTIPLES D'AUBES DE ROTOR DISPOSES A PROXIMITE ET AUTOUR DU MEME COMPOSANT DE MOYEU ET COMPORTANT EN OUTRE DES COMPOSANTS DE BARRIERE CONFIGURES POUR FORMER DES PASSAGES AFIN D'ACHEMINER DU FLUIDE A TRAVERS LES JEUX MULTIPLES D'AUBES DE ROTOR | [2008/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 31.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/02] | 04.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.2014 | 31.12.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2115330 (DEMAG AG) [X] 1-38,46-49 * the whole document * * figures 1-10 *; | [X]JPH03115795 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al) [X] 1-28,46-49 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6062028 (ARNOLD STEVEN DON [US], et al) [X] 29-38 * the whole document * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US3303993 (ANDREWS THOMAS D H, et al) [X] 39-45 * the whole document * * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US6430917 (PLATTS DAVID A [US]) [X] 39-45 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2115330 |