EP1940373 - 1-FLUORO-1-DEOXY-SCYLLO-INOSITOL FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/28] | INOSITOL DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USES IN THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES CHARACTERIZED BY ABNORMAL PROTEIN FOLDING OR AGGREGATION OR AMYLOID FORMATION, DESPOSITION, ACCUMULATION OR PERSISTENCE | ||
[2014/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, NL, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waratah Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 101 College Street Suite 220 Toronto, ON M5G 1L7 / CA | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRUZ, Antonio 89 Dunloe Road Toronto, Ontario M5P 2T7 / CA | 02 /
KURDYDYK, Linda 215 St. Clements Toronto, Ontario M4R 1H3 / CA | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Holliday, Louise Caroline, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/28] | Holliday, Louise Caroline, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06850456.2 | 13.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006IB04181 | Priority number, date | US20050725634P | 13.10.2005 Original published format: US 725634 P | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007119108 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1940373 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1940373 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1940373 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 13.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/045, A61K31/047, A61K31/075, A61P25/28 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/045 (EP,US);
C07C55/28 (US);
A61K31/047 (EP,US);
A61K31/075 (EP,US);
A61K31/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/66 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P31/08 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07C43/196 (US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/28] | A61K31/075, A23L1/30, A61K31/047, A61P25/28, A61K31/045 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/19] |
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 1-FLUORO-1-DEOXY-SCYLLO-INOSITOL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ALZHEIMER'SCHE KRANKHEIT | [2014/47] | English: | 1-FLUORO-1-DEOXY-SCYLLO-INOSITOL FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE | [2014/47] | French: | 1-FLUORO-1-DEOXY-SCYLLO-INOSITOL DESTINE AU TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER | [2014/47] |
Former [2008/28] | INOSITOL-DERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN, DIE DURCH ABNORMALE PROTEINFALTUNG ODER AGGREGATION ODER AMYLOID-BILDUNG, ABSCHEIDUNG, AKKUMULATION ODER PERSISTENZ GEKENNZEICHNET SIND | ||
Former [2008/28] | INOSITOL DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USES IN THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES CHARACTERIZED BY ABNORMAL PROTEIN FOLDING OR AGGREGATION OR AMYLOID FORMATION, DESPOSITION, ACCUMULATION OR PERSISTENCE | ||
Former [2008/28] | DERIVES DE L'INOSITOL ET LEURS UTILISATIONS POUR TRAITER DES MALADIES CARACTÉRISÉES PAR UN REPLIEMENT PROTÉIQUE ANORMAL, UNE AGRÉGATION PROTÉIQUE, OU UNE FORMATION, UN DÉPÔT, UNE ACCUMULATION OU UNE PERSISTANCE D'AMYLOÏDE | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 28.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.09.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 03.09.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2006 | AT | 06.05.2015 | BE | 06.05.2015 | CY | 06.05.2015 | CZ | 06.05.2015 | DK | 06.05.2015 | EE | 06.05.2015 | ES | 06.05.2015 | FI | 06.05.2015 | IT | 06.05.2015 | LT | 06.05.2015 | LV | 06.05.2015 | MC | 06.05.2015 | NL | 06.05.2015 | PL | 06.05.2015 | RO | 06.05.2015 | SE | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | TR | 06.05.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | GR | 07.08.2015 | IS | 06.09.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | GB | 13.10.2015 | IE | 13.10.2015 | LU | 13.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | FR | 02.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/45] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
GB | 13.10.2015 | ||
IE | 13.10.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
GB | 13.10.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
GB | 13.10.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [PXL]WO2007041855 (WARATAH PHARMACEUTICALS INC [CA], et al) [PXL] 1-24 * abstract * * L: Priority * * page 1, line 12 - page 6, line 20 ** claims 1-50 *; | [PXL]WO2007134449 (WARATAH PHARMACEUTICALS INC [CA], et al) [PXL] 1-24 * abstract * * L: Priority * * page 1, line 23 - line 25 * * page 22, line 28 - page 34, line 22 * * claim 27 * | International search | [X]CA2214635 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]); | [X]CA2486663 (CHOMCZYNSKI PIOTR [US]); | [X]WO2004075882 (ELLIPSIS BIOTHERAPEUTICS CORP [CA], et al); | [XP]WO2006053428 (MCLAURIN JOANNE [CA]) | Examination | - SUN Y ET AL, "Synthesis of scyllo-inositol derivatives and their effects on amyloid beta peptide aggregation", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 16, no. 15, doi:10.1016/J.BMC.2008.06.045, ISSN 0968-0896, (20080801), pages 7177 - 7184, (20080626), XP023610694 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2008.06.045 | by applicant | WO2004075882 | - BOUVEAULT L. BULL., LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE PARIS, (1894), vol. 11, pages 44 - 147 | - MICHAELIS T ET AL., NMR IN BIOMEDICIEN, (1993), vol. 6, pages 105 - 109 | - S. M. BERGE ET AL., J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, page 1 | - FIESER; FIESER'S, Reagents for Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1991), pages 1 - 17 | - Rodd's Chemistry of Carbon Compounds, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1989), vol. 1-5 | - Organic Reactions, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1991), vol. 1- 40 | - MARCH J., Advanced Organic Chemistry, 4th ed., JOHN WILEY AND SONS | - HUSSON, C., CARBOHYRATE RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 307, pages 163 - 165 | - SARMAH, M.P.; SHASHIDAR, M.S., CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 338, pages 999 - 1001 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY | - CHISHTI, M. A., J.BIOL CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, pages 21562 - 21570 | - JANUS,C., NATURE, (2000), vol. 408, pages 979 - 982 | - WILTFANG, J. ET AL., J NEUROCHEM, (2002), vol. 81, pages 481 - 496 | - HACCOU, P.; MELLIS, E., Statistical Analysis of Behavioural Data, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1995), pages 120 - 186 | - CHISHTI, M. A. ET AL., J. BIOL CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, pages 21562 - 21570 | - JANUS,C. ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 408, pages 979 - 982 | - O'HARE, E. ET AL., BEHAVIOR PHARMACOLOGY, (1996), vol. 7, pages 742 - 753 | - RICHARDSON, RL ET AL., BRAIN RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 54, pages 1 - 10 | - KHETERPAL, I ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 40, no. 39, page 11757 | - CANNON MJ ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM., (2004), vol. 328, no. 1, page 67 | - LETICIA TOLEDO-SHERMAN ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2005), vol. 48, page 3221 | - SLON-USAKIEWICZ J.J. ET AL., CLIN. PROTEOM. J., (2004), vol. 1, pages 227 - 234 |