EP2069629 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE FAN VARIABLE AREA NOZZLE WITH SWIVALABLE INSERT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERO, Edward B. 71 Michele Dr. Somers, CT 06071 / US | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/25] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06850521.3 | 12.10.2006 | [2009/25] | WO2006US40249 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008045091 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2069629 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2069629 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/06, F01D17/14 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
F01D17/14 (EP,US);
F02K1/06 (EP,US);
F02K1/52 (EP,US);
F05D2220/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/25] | Title | German: | MANTELTRIEBWERK-DÜSE MIT VERÄNDERLICHEM QUERSCHNITT MIT SCHWENKBAREM EINSATZSYSTEM | [2013/40] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE FAN VARIABLE AREA NOZZLE WITH SWIVALABLE INSERT SYSTEM | [2009/25] | French: | TUYÈRE À SECTION VARIABLE D'UNE SOUFFLANTE DE TURBORÉACTEUR DOUBLE FLUX ÉQUIPÉE D'UN SYSTÈME À PIÈCES RAPPORTÉES PIVOTANTES | [2013/40] |
Former [2009/25] | TRIEBWERKGEBLÄSE MIT DÜSE MIT VARIABLEM QUERSCHNITT MIT SCHWENKBAREM EINSATZSYSTEM | ||
Former [2009/25] | BUSE À SECTION VARIABLE D'UN VENTILATEUR DE TURBINE À GAZ ÉQUIPÉE D'UN SYSTÈME À PIÈCES RAPPORTÉES PIVOTANTES | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 12.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3598318 (SCHIEL THEODOR J) [X] 1-8,11,13-16 * column 2, lines 11-36 - column 2, lines 61-67; figures 1,2,4,5 * * column 5, lines 14-20 *; | [X]US5782431 (GAL-OR BENJAMIN [IL], et al) [X] 1,8-10,13,17 * column 7, lines 5-50; figure 1 *; | [X]US5054285 (GEIDEL HELMUT-ARND [DE], et al) [X] 1,8,12,13 * column 5, lines 12-57; figure 4 *; | [X]EP1191214 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,3,8,13 * paragraph [0030]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US3477230 (BAUGER LOUIS JULES, et al) [X] 1-5,8,13,14 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2004187476 (LAIR JEAN-PIERRE [US]) [X] 1,8,13 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038]; figures 1,5-7 *; | [X]GB2372729 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,8,13 * figures 6,7 *; | [A]US3877663 (CURRAN ROBERT W, et al) [A] 1-17 * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US3598318 | US5782431 | US5054285 | EP1191214 | US3477230 | US2007187476 | GB2372729 |