EP1965700 - ANALYTE MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Diabetes Care Inc. 1360 South Loop Road Alameda, CA 94502 / US | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUYANG, Tianmei 1360 South Loop Road Alameda, CA 94502 / US | 02 /
LIU, Zenghe 101 Payot Court Alameda, CA 94502 / US | 03 /
CHO, Hyun 2540 College Avenue 105 Berkeley, CA 94704 / US | 04 /
FELDMAN, Benjamin, J. 5830 Colby Street Oakland, CA 94618 / US | [2008/42] |
Former [2008/37] | 01 /
OUYANG, Tianmei 1360 South Loop Road Alameda, CA 94502 / US | ||
02 /
LIU, Zhenghe 101 Payot Court Alameda, CA 94502 / US | |||
03 /
CHO, Hyun 2540 College Avenue 105 Berkeley, CA 94704 / US | |||
04 /
FELDMAN, Benjamin, J. 5830 Colby Street Oakland, CA 94618 / US | Representative(s) | Tollett, Ian, et al Williams Powell 44 Prespect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Tollett, Ian, et al Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | ||
Former [2008/37] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06851052.8 | 26.12.2006 | [2008/37] | WO2006US62607 | Priority number, date | US20050322165 | 28.12.2005 Original published format: US 322165 | [2008/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007126444 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1965700 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145, A61B5/1486 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
A61B5/14865 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/0031 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/37] | A61B5/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Title | German: | ANALYTÜBERWACHUNG | [2008/37] | English: | ANALYTE MONITORING | [2008/37] | French: | SURVEILLANCE D'ANALYTE | [2008/37] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 09.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 17.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/40] | Divisional application(s) | EP12162188.2 / EP2491860 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003187338 (SAY JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11,15* paragraphs [0069] , [0076] - [0087] - [0123] - [0135] - [0177] - [0195]; figure - * | International search | [X]US2003045783 (MARCH WAYNE FRONT [US], et al); | [Y]US2005245799 (BRAUKER JAMES H [US], et al); | [Y]US2005107677 (WARD W KENNETH [US], et al); | [Y]US2004247603 (SABBADINI ROGER A [US]); | [Y]US2004045879 (SHULTS MARK C [US], et al); | [Y]US6632844 (LANDT MICHAEL [US]); | [Y]US6833490 (GODDIJN OSCAR JOHANNES MARIA [NL], et al) | by applicant | US2003187338 |