EP1917368 - METHODS AND KITS FOR EVALUATING DNA METHYLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5791 Van Allen Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5791 Van Alley Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Applied Biosystems, LLC 5791 Van Allen Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states Applera Corporation 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYD, Victoria 199 Fir Street San Carlos, CA 94070 United States of America / US | 02 /
LIVAK, Kenneth 1148 Polk Lane San Jose, CA 95117 United States of America / US | 03 /
ZON, Gerald 199 Fir Street San Carlos, CA 94070 United States of America / US | [2008/20] |
Former [2008/19] | 01 /
BOYD, Victoria 199 Fir Street San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | ||
02 /
LIVAK, Kenneth 1148 Polk Lane San Jose, CA 95117 / US | |||
03 /
ZON, Gerald 199 Fir Street San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | Grund, Martin GRUND Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06851402.5 | 16.06.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006US23669 | Priority number, date | US20050691608P | 16.06.2005 Original published format: US 691608 P | US20060424224 | 14.06.2006 Original published format: US 424224 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008018855 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1917368 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
C12Q1/686 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/686, C12Q2565/125, C12Q2523/125 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/20] | C12Q1/68, C12P19/34 | ||
Former IPC [2008/19] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KITS ZUR BEURTEILUNG VON DNA-METHYLIERUNG | [2008/19] | English: | METHODS AND KITS FOR EVALUATING DNA METHYLATION | [2008/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET TROUSSES POUR L'ÉVALUATION DE LA MÉTHYLATION DE L'ADN | [2008/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/37] | 27.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6013435 (NUSBAUM NEIL J [US]) [X] 39-41 * column 16, line 62 - column 17, line 18 *; | [DXY]US6265171 (HERMAN JAMES G [US], et al) [DX] 39,41 * the whole document * [Y] 1-38,40; | [X]US6399304 (KILGER CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 39,41 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0091] *; | [X]EP1457556 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 39,41 * page 4, paragraph 17 *; | [PX]WO2005071106 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-41* the whole document *; | [DXY] - YAMAMOTO T ET AL, "METHYLATION ASSAY BY NUCLEOTIDE INCORPORATION: A QUANTITATIVE ASSAY FOR REGIONAL CPG METHYLATION DENSITY", BIOTECHNIQUES, INFORMA LIFE SCIENCES PUBLISHING, WESTBOROUGH, MA, US, (20040101), vol. 36, no. 5, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 846 - 854, XP001247943 [DX] 1-4,7,9-14,17,18 * the whole document * [Y] 19-38 | [DY] - BOYD V L AND ZON G, "Bisulfite conversion of genomic DNA for methylation analysis: protocol simplification with higher recovery applicable to limited samples and increased throughput", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 326, pages 278 - 280, XP002553975 [DY] 1-41 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2003.11.020 | [DY] - XIONG Z AND LAIRD P W, "COBRA: a sensitive and quantitative DNA methylation assay", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19970101), vol. 25, no. 12, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 2532 - 2534, XP002106407 [DY] 1-41 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.12.2532 | [DY] - HERMAN J G ET AL, "METHYLATION-SPECIFIC PCR: A NOVEL PCR ASSAY FOR METHYLATION STATUS OF CPG ISLANDS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19960901), vol. 93, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9821 - 9826, XP002910406 [DY] 1-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.18.9821 | [DY] - GHADESSY F J ET AL, "Generic expansion of the substrate spectrum of a DNA polymerase by directed evolution", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20040601), vol. 22, no. 6, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 755 - 759, XP002320329 [DY] 40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt974 | [DA] - LI L-C ET AL, "MethPrimer: designing primers for methylation PCRs", BIOINFORMATICS, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20021101), vol. 18, no. 11, ISSN 1367-4803, pages 1427 - 1431, XP003004907 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/18.11.1427 | [DA] - COUVERT P ET AL, "DHPLC-BASED METHOD FOR DNA METHYLATION ANALYSIS OF DIFFERENTIAL METHYLATED REGIONS FROM IMPRINTED GENES", BIOTECHNIQUES, INFORMA LIFE SCIENCES PUBLISHING, WESTBOROUGH, MA, US, (20030201), vol. 34, no. 2, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 356 - 362, XP009039901 [DA] * abstract * | [DA] - BROWNSTEIN M J ET AL, "MODULATION OF NON-TEMPLATED NUCLEOTIDE ADDITION BY TAQ DNA POLYMERASE: PRIMER MODIFICATIONS THAT FACILITATE GENOTYPING", BIOTECHNIQUES, INFORMA LIFE SCIENCES PUBLISHING, WESTBOROUGH, MA, US, (19960601), vol. 20, no. 6, ISSN 0736-6205, page 1004,1006,1008, XP002027777 [DA] * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4879214 (KORNHER JOHN S [US], et al); | [Y]US6331393 (LAIRD PETER W [US], et al); | [Y]US2004101843 (ZON GERALD [US]); | [X]US2005095623 (ZON GERALD [US], et al); | [Y] - EADS C.A. ET AL., "MethylLight: a high-throughput assay to measure DNA methylation", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20000415), vol. 28, no. 8, pages E32-I - E32-VIII, XP002341618 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/28.8.e32 | [Y] - FACKLER ET AL., "Quantitative Multiplex Methylation-Specific PCR Assay for the Detection of Promoter Hypermethylation in Multiple Genes in Breast Cancer", CANCER RESEARCH, (20040701), vol. 64, pages 4442 - 4452 | [AP] - BOYD V.L. ET AL., "Methylation-dependent fragment separation: Direct detection of DNA methylation by capillary electrophoresis of PCR products from bisulfite-converted genomic DNA", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 354, pages 266 - 273, XP024942130 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2006.04.009 |