EP1772863 - Optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/15] | Methof of manufacturing an optical recording medium | ||
[2007/18] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 1538654 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takishita, Toshihiko, c/o Pioneer Video Corp. 2680, Nishihanawa Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi / JP | 02 /
Kato, Masahiro, c/o Pioneer Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-city Saitama / JP | 03 /
Muramatsu, Eiji, c/o Pioneer Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-city Saitama / JP | 04 /
Horikawa, Kunihiko, Pioneer Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-city Saitama / JP | 05 /
Taniguchi, Shoji, c/o Pioneer Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-city Saitama / JP | 06 /
Yamaguchi, Atsushi, c/o Pioneer Tokorozama Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-city Saitama / JP | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Klingseisen, Franz Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000034.4 | 05.04.2000 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | JP19990101466 | 08.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10146699 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1772863 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1772863 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/26, G11B7/007 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
G11B7/261 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/24079 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/24082 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/24085 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2007/00709 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2007/15] | G11B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/15] | Title | German: | Optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2007/18] | English: | Optical recording medium | [2007/18] | French: | Support d'enregistrement optique | [2007/18] |
Former [2007/15] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines optischen Aufzeichnungsmediums | ||
Former [2007/15] | Methof of manufacturing an optical recording medium | ||
Former [2007/15] | Procédé de fabrication d'un support d'enregistrement optique | Examination procedure | 02.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 15.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00107085.3 / EP1043714 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0751506 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0944907 (RICOH KK) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0800165 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 4* the whole document * |