EP1826955 - Addressable outlet, and a network using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conversant Intellectual Property Management Inc. 390 March Road Suite 100 Ottawa, ON K2K 0G7 / CA | [2014/44] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states MOSAID Technologies Incorporated 11 Hines Road, Suite 203 Ottawa, ON K2K 2X1 / CA | ||
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states Serconet Ltd. 16 Ha'Haroshet Street, P.O. Box 2009 43657 Raanana / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Binder, Yehuda 30 Yeshurun Street 45200 Hod Hasharon / IL | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/35] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07000180.5 | 12.11.2003 | [2007/35] | Priority number, date | IL20020152824 | 13.11.2002 Original published format: IL 15282402 | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1826955 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/44, H04M11/06 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
H04L12/44 (EP,US);
H04L12/2803 (EP,US);
H04L41/0677 (EP,US);
H04L12/2818 (EP,US);
H04L12/2827 (EP,US);
H04L2012/2843 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/19] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Adressierbare Steckdose und ein Netzwerk damit | [2007/35] | English: | Addressable outlet, and a network using same | [2007/35] | French: | Sortie adressable et un réseau l'utilisant | [2007/35] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 20.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/44] | 21.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03773960.4 / EP1563643 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030773960) is 24.10.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0200016 (RAFI GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 4* abstract *; | [X]US4785448 (REICHERT ANDREW R [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * column A * * column 1, lines 61-65 - column 2, lines 3-14 * * column 3 - column 4 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2301743 (DSC COMMUNICATIONS [US]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 1, lines 21-23 * * page 6, lines 7-21 * * page 21, lines 14-30 * * page 22, lines 4-9 * * page 23, lines 4-20 * * page 26, lines 7-30 * * page 32, lines 5-9 * * figures 1,2,15 *; | [X]WO0007322 (SERCONET LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 3 * * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 15 * * page 8, line 14 - page 10, line 11 * * page 11, line 7 - page 12, line 14 * * page 14, lines 22-31 * * figures 5-10 *; | [A]WO0171980 (SERCONET LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 23, lines 6-8 * * claim 1 * * figures 5,6 * |