EP1890313 - Plasma display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hong, Sang Min 1206-13 Sinjeong3-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lee, Sang Kook Dongyanghansin Apt. 103-103 Songjeong-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | 03 /
Oh, Han Ick 68-2 Sang-dong, Suseong-gu Daegu-si / KR | 04 /
Eom, Ki Eon 27-13 Byeon-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon / KR | 05 /
Lee, Jin Han 104-1307 Seongho Apt., 500-1 Byeongjeom-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000195.3 | 05.01.2007 | [2008/08] | Priority number, date | KR20060078405 | 18.08.2006 Original published format: KR 20060078405 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1890313 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1890313 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1890313 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/04, H01J17/49 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
H01J11/32 (EP,US);
H01J11/22 (KR);
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/24 (EP,US);
H01J2211/245 (EP,US);
H01J2211/323 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2008/51] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plasmaanzeigetafel | [2008/08] | English: | Plasma display panel | [2008/08] | French: | Panneau d'affichage à plasma | [2008/08] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 16.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002047591 (HIRANO NAOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0138]; figure 19j *; | [Y]US2002063510 (YURA SHINSUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 17-19* paragraphs [0081] - [0086]; figures 9,10 *; | [Y]US2004041522 (TAKADA YUUSUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 16-18 * paragraphs [0116] - [0150]; figure 12 *; | [X]US2005029941 (KWON JAE-IK [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,14 * paragraphs [0045] - [0057]; figures 1,6a *; | [X]US2005134176 (KWON JAE-IK [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,7,10,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0045] - [0078]; figures 6-21 *; | [XY]EP1659608 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-6,14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0041]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 16-19 | Examination | US2006076877 | by applicant | US2005029941 | US2005134176 | EP1659608 |