EP1792873 - Nanostructured oxides and hydroxides and methods of synthesis therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Connecticut The Graduate Center 438 Whitney Road Storrs, CT 06268 / US | For all designated states Rutgers, The State University of New Jersey 377 Hoes Lane Piscataway, NJ 08855-1179 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states The University of Connecticut The Graduate Center, 438 Whitney Road Storrs Connecticut 06268 / US | ||
For all designated states Rutgers, The State University of New Jersey 377 Hoes Lane Piscataway, NJ 08855-1179 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xiao, Tongsan D. 50 Hall Hill Road Willington, CT 06279 / US | 02 /
Strutt, Peter R. 126 Clover Mill Road Mansfield Center, CT 06250 / US | 03 /
Kear, Bernhard H. 10 Campbell Brook Road Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889 / US | 04 /
Chen, Huimin Apartment 75, 1 Northwood Road Storrs, CT 06269 / US | 05 /
Wang, Donald M. Apartment 75, 1 Northwood Road Stoors, CT 06269 / US | [2008/01] |
Former [2007/32] | 01 /
Xiao, Tongsan D. D 106 Forest Park Apartment, West Road Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | ||
02 /
Strutt, Peter R. 126 Clover Mill Road Mansfield Center, CT 06250 / US | |||
03 /
Kear, Bernhard H. 10 Campbell Brook Road Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889 / US | |||
04 /
Chen, Huimin Apartment 75, 1 Northwood Road Storrs, CT 06269 / US | |||
05 /
Wang, Donald M. Apartment 75, 1 Northwood Road Stoors, CT 06269 / US | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/46] |
Former [2008/43] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Intellectual Property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/23] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000421.3 | 18.11.1997 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | US19960031355P | 18.11.1996 Original published format: US 31355 P | US19960031672P | 22.11.1996 Original published format: US 31672 P | US19970039888P | 05.03.1997 Original published format: US 39888 P | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1792873 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C01B13/34, C01G53/04, C01G45/02, C01G25/02 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
C01B13/34 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
C01G23/04 (EP);
C01G25/02 (EP);
C01G45/00 (EP);
C01G45/02 (EP);
C01G53/00 (EP);
C01G53/04 (EP);
C04B35/62231 (EP);
C01P2002/01 (EP);
C01P2002/52 (EP);
C01P2002/72 (EP);
C01P2004/03 (EP);
C01P2004/04 (EP);
C01P2004/10 (EP);
C01P2004/12 (EP);
C01P2004/16 (EP);
C01P2004/32 (EP);
C01P2004/50 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2004/62 (EP);
C01P2004/64 (EP);
C01P2006/11 (EP);
C01P2006/12 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/23] | Title | German: | Nanostrukturierte Oxide und Hydroxide sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2007/23] | English: | Nanostructured oxides and hydroxides and methods of synthesis therefor | [2007/23] | French: | Oxydes et hydroxydes nanostructurés et leurs procédés de synthese | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 31.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/38] | 23.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: translation not filed in time [2011/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97949485.3 / EP0876295 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970949485) is 26.08.1999 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2602070 (JOHN KIRKPATRICK WILLIAM) [X] 15-17 * example II *; | [X]US3259585 (FITCH FREDERICK T, et al) [X] 21,22 * claim 1 * * column 2, line 70 - column 3, line 7 *; | [X]US4639356 (O'TOOLE MICHAEL P [US], et al) [X] 51 * claim 1 * * example 1 *; | [X]EP0233343 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 21,22 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0621234 (INST GAS TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 51* examples II,III *; | [X]US5447708 (HELBLE JOSEPH J [US], et al) [X] 51 * claim 1 * * column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 11 * * figures 3A,3B,4 *; | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19921019), ISSN 0009-2258, XP000353514 [X] 18-20 * abstract * |