EP1810637 - Dental milling cutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Brasseler GmbH & Co. KG Trophagener Weg 25 D-32657 Lemgo / DE | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meier, Friedrich Wilhelm Ebsdorfer Strasse 17 32825 Blomberg / DE | 02 /
Hecke, Josef Pohlkamp 6 32694 Dörentrup / DE | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000509.5 | 11.01.2007 | [2007/30] | Priority number, date | DE20061002722 | 19.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006002722 | [2007/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1810637 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61C3/02 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
A61C3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Title | German: | Dentalfräser | [2007/30] | English: | Dental milling cutter | [2007/30] | French: | Fraise de dentiste | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0120542 (FLUCKIGER & HUGUENIN SA [CH]) [X] 1-12 * page 6, lines 14-24 * * claims 1-5 * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP1243366 (BUSCH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-12* figure 5 * |