EP1943980 - Screwing tool and retaining element for a screwing tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZL Microdent-Attachment GmbH & Co. KG Schützenstrasse 6-8 58339 Breckerfeld / DE | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böschemeyer, Thomas Wilhelm-Huck-Strasse 6 A 58313 Herdecke / DE | 02 /
Clostermann, Volkhard-Hagen Kreishausstrasse 11 58097 Hagen / DE | 03 /
Dragotto, Nico Ferdinandstrasse 58 44536 Lünen / DE | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Kötter, Ulrich Patentanwalt Stresemannstrasse 15 58095 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Kötter, Ulrich Patentanwalt Stresemannstrasse 15 58095 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000591.3 | 12.01.2007 | [2008/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1943980 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, B25B23/10 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
A61C8/0089 (EP);
B25B23/105 (EP);
B25B23/108 (EP);
A61C8/0087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/13] |
Former [2008/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schraubwerkzeug und Halteelement für ein Schraubwerkzeug | [2008/29] | English: | Screwing tool and retaining element for a screwing tool | [2008/29] | French: | Tournevis et élément d'arrêt pour tournevis | [2008/29] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/29] | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2189858 (SOURDILLON AIRINDEX SA) [A] 1* figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE9306146U (ASTRA AB [SE]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-6 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO9706930 (STRAUMANN INST AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 2,3,7 *; | [X]US2001019816 (KUMAR AJAY [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0062] * * figures 7B,7C,7D,8A,8B,8C *; | [XA]DE10333013 (MEDENTIS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0035] * * figures 1-5 * [A] 2-10 |