EP1818685 - Optical detection system for deriving information on an object occupying a vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/33] | Optical detection system for deriving information on an abject occupying a vehicle seat | ||
[2007/38] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKATA CORPORATION 4-30, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | [2007/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoki, Hiroshi Takata Corporation 4-30 Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | 02 /
Yokoo, Masato Takata Corporation 4-30 Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | 03 /
Hakomori, Yuu Takata Corporation 4-30 Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/33] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000705.9 | 15.01.2007 | [2007/33] | Priority number, date | JP20060036760 | 14.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006036760 | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1818685 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1818685 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/02, G01S17/08, B60R21/015 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
G01S17/08 (EP,US);
B60R21/01538 (EP,US);
G01S17/04 (EP,US);
G01S17/894 (EP,US);
G01S7/4911 (EP,US);
G01S7/4918 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/17] |
Former [2007/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Detektionssystem zur Gewinnung von Information über ein Objekt in einem Fahrzeugsitz | [2007/33] | English: | Optical detection system for deriving information on an object occupying a vehicle seat | [2007/38] | French: | Système de détection optique pour gagner des informations sur un objet occupant un siège de véhicule | [2007/33] |
Former [2007/33] | Optical detection system for deriving information on an abject occupying a vehicle seat | Examination procedure | 07.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 16.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1039314 (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 1-3,12-16 *; | [XY]US2004085448 (GOTO TOMOYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0058] - [0060]; figures 1,10 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0057]; figures 2-4 * [Y] 2-8; | [Y]US2004153229 (GOKTURK SALIH BURAK [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0117]; figures 2,13 *; | [Y]US6968073 (O'BOYLE MICHAEL E [US], et al) [Y] 1-8* column 2, line 38 - column 5, line 7; figures 1,2,4-8 * |