EP1832690 - Building element for heat insulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÖCK BAUTEILE GmbH Vimbucher Strasse 2 76534 Baden-Baden / DE | [2007/42] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states SCHÖCK BAUTEILE GmbH Vimbucher Strasse 2 76534 Baden-Baden / DE | ||
For all designated states NIHON KAISER LTD. EBISU MT BLDG 3-15-7 Higashi Shibuya-Ku Tokyo 260-0011 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritschi, Hubert Dahlienstrasse 27c 76327 Pfinztal / DE | 02 /
Tobishima, Yasufumi c/o NIHON KAISER LTD. EBISU MT BLDG 3-15-7 Higashi Shibuya-Ku Tokyo 150-0011 / JP | 03 /
Ishii, Noboru c/o TAKARA TSUSHO CO.,LTD 4-7-10,Nihonbashi-Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | Blumenröhr, Dietrich, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000846.1 | 17.01.2007 | [2007/37] | Priority number, date | DE20061011336 | 09.03.2006 Original published format: DE 10611336 | [2007/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1832690 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1832690 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1832690 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/00, E04B1/48 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
E04B1/0038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Title | German: | Bauelement zur Wärmedämmung | [2007/37] | English: | Building element for heat insulation | [2007/37] | French: | Elément de construction pour isolation thermique | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 25.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.11.2008 | CZ | 12.11.2008 | DK | 12.11.2008 | EE | 12.11.2008 | FI | 12.11.2008 | IE | 12.11.2008 | LT | 12.11.2008 | LV | 12.11.2008 | NL | 12.11.2008 | PL | 12.11.2008 | SK | 12.11.2008 | TR | 12.11.2008 | LU | 17.01.2009 | BE | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | SE | 12.02.2009 | GR | 13.02.2009 | ES | 23.02.2009 | IS | 12.03.2009 | PT | 13.04.2009 | HU | 13.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 17.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
HU | 13.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 17.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FI | 12.11.2008 | |
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 12.11.2008 | |
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 23.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0402343 (FUHS JOSEF [AT]) [A] 1-9* figure 1 *; | [A]EP0834622 (SCHOECK BAUTEILE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE29903589U (SCHOECK BAUTEILE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figure 2 * |