EP1770627 - Systems and methods for matching, selecting, narrowcasting, and/or classifying based on rights management and/or other information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intertrust Technologies Corporation 920 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2012/12] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Intertrust Technologies Corp 955 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale CA 94085-3913 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shear, Victor H 5203 Battery Lane Bethesda, MD 20705 / US | 02 /
Van Wie, David M P.O. Box 5610 Eugene, OR 97405 / US | 03 /
Weber, Robert P 50 Watertown Street, Suite 607 Watertown, MA 02472-2533 / US | [2007/28] |
Former [2007/14] | 01 /
Shear, Victor H 5203 Battery Lane Bethesda, MD 20705 / US | ||
02 /
Van Wie, David M Apartment 216, 965 East EL Camino Real Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | |||
03 /
Weber, Robert P 50 Watertown Street, Suite 607 Watertown, MA 02472-2533 / US | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael Ian, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Williams, Michael Ian, et al fj Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07000848.7 | 06.11.1998 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | US19970965185 | 06.11.1997 Original published format: US 965185 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1770627 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1770627 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2145 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2149 (EP,US);
G08B2001/085 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/14] | Title | German: | Systeme und Methoden zur Übereinstimmung, Auswahl, Verteilung an eine begrenzte Anzahl von Empfängern und/oder Klassifikation basierend auf Verwaltung von Rechten und/oder anderer Information | [2007/14] | English: | Systems and methods for matching, selecting, narrowcasting, and/or classifying based on rights management and/or other information | [2007/14] | French: | Systèmes et procédés de comparaison, de sélection, de distribution restreinte, et/ou de classification selon des données relatives à une gestion des droits et/ou d'autres données | [2007/14] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.06.2012 | 31.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/42] | 10.06.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 15.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98956642.7 / EP1027674 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980956642) is 15.04.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9617467 (HERZ FREDERICK [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]WO9624092 (BENSON GREG [SE], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 23 - line 37 * * page 5, line 4 - page 7, line 29 * * page 17, line 22 - page 18, line 9 *; | [X]WO9627155 (ELECTRONIC PUBLISHING RESOURCE [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2,5a,51a * * page 85, paragraph 1 - page 86, paragraph 2 * * page 164, paragraph 2 - page 169, paragraph 2 * * page 174, paragraph 3 - page 175, paragraph L * * page 756, paragraph 2 - page 761, paragraph 1 * * page 799, paragraph L - page 800, paragraph 1 *; | [A]WO9722074 (CYBERGOLD INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9617467 | WO9624092 | WO9627155 | WO9722074 | WO9743761 |