EP1803807 - Virulence genes, proteins, and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microscience Limited 545 Eskdale Road, Winnersh Triangle Wokingham Berkshire RG41 5TU / GB | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tang, Christopher, Imperial College of Science Technology and Medicine, The Flowers Building Armstrong Road, London SW7 2AZ / GB | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2007/27] | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07000976.6 | 18.05.2001 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | GB20000012079 | 18.05.2000 Original published format: GB 0012079 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1803807 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1803807 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/36, C12N15/31, C07K14/22, C07K16/12, A61K39/095, A61P37/02 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
C07K14/22 (EP,US);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/522 (EP,US);
A61K2039/523 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/27] | Title | German: | VIRULENZ GENE, PROTEINE, UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2007/35] | English: | Virulence genes, proteins, and their use | [2007/27] | French: | GENES DE VIRULENCE, PROTEINES, ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/27] | Virulenzgene, Proteine, und ihre Verwendung | ||
Former [2007/27] | Gènes de virulence, protéines, et leur utilisation | Examination procedure | 04.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 07.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/07] | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/07] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01931888.0 / EP1290137 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AY]WO9856901 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al); | [PX]WO0071725 (CHIRON SPA [IT], et al); |