EP1947644 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING AN ACOUSTIC SIGNAL WITH EXTENDED BAND-WIDTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/30] | Method and apparatus for providing an acoustic signal with extended band-width | ||
[2019/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuance Communications, Inc. 1 Wayside Road Burlington, MA 01803-4613 / US | [2011/48] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iser, Bernd Uhrenmachergasse 9 89077 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Nüssle, Gerhard Kornblumenweg 7 89134 Blaustein / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Gerhard Jörg-Syrlin-Strasse 26 89081 Ulm / DE | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/25] |
Former [2008/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07001062.4 | 18.01.2007 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1947644 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1947644 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/038 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
G10L21/038 (EP,US);
H04R3/04 (KR);
H04R3/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | G10L21/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/25] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES TONSIGNALS MIT ERWEITERTER BANDBREITE | [2019/05] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING AN ACOUSTIC SIGNAL WITH EXTENDED BAND-WIDTH | [2019/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL FOURNISSANT UN SIGNAL ACOUSTIQUE AVEC UNE LARGEUR DE BANDE ÉTENDUE | [2019/05] |
Former [2008/30] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung eines Tonsignals mit erweiterter Bandbreite | ||
Former [2008/30] | Method and apparatus for providing an acoustic signal with extended band-width | ||
Former [2008/30] | Procédé et appareil fournissant un signal acoustique avec une largeur de bande étendue | Examination procedure | 20.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 21.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2007 | AT | 19.06.2019 | CY | 19.06.2019 | CZ | 19.06.2019 | DK | 19.06.2019 | EE | 19.06.2019 | ES | 19.06.2019 | FI | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | NL | 19.06.2019 | PL | 19.06.2019 | RO | 19.06.2019 | SE | 19.06.2019 | SI | 19.06.2019 | SK | 19.06.2019 | TR | 19.06.2019 | BG | 19.09.2019 | GR | 20.09.2019 | IS | 19.10.2019 | PT | 21.10.2019 | IE | 18.01.2020 | LU | 18.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/08] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IE | 18.01.2020 | ||
LU | 18.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
LU | 18.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
LU | 18.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003187663 (TRUMAN MICHAEL MEAD [US], et al) [X] 1,24,25 * column 10, paragraph 62 - column 11, paragraph 67 * [Y] 18-21; | [X]EP1367566 (CODING TECHNOLOGIES SWEDEN AB [SE]) [X] 1,24,25 * page 3, paragraph 12 - page 4, paragraph 14 * * page 9, paragraph 40 - page 15, paragraph 63 *; | [Y] - ISER B ET AL, "BANDWIDTH EXTENSION OF TELEPHONY SPEECH", EURASIP NEWS LETTER, (200506), vol. 16, no. 2, ISSN 1687-1421, pages 2 - 24, XP002372006 [Y] 18-21 * page 9, line 1 - line 12 * * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 23 * | [A] - YASUKAWA H ED - EUROPEAN SPEECH COMMUNICATION ASSOCIATION (ESCA), "ENHANCEMENT OF TELEPHONE SPEECH QUALITY BY SIMPLE SPECTRUM EXTRAPOLATION METHOD", 4TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SPEECH COMMUNICATION AND TECHNOLOGY. EUROSPEECH '95. MADRID, SPAIN, SEPT. 18 - 21, 1995, EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON SPEECH COMMUNICATION AND TECHNOLOGY. (EUROSPEECH), MADRID : GRAFICAS BRENS, ES, MAdrid, Spain, (19950918), VOL. 2 CONF. 4, pages 1545 - 1548, XP000854997 [A] 1-24 * page 1546, column L, line 2 - line 19; figure 2 * | Examination | US7676043 |