EP1811569 - Organic light emitting display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Display Co., Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2008/30] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states LG Display Co., Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong, Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sung, Myeon Chang Woorimjutek 302 219-8, Gusan-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kim, Changnam Hyundai Artvilla 303 317-5, Yangjae-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Kim, Sangkyoon 470-24, Deokpung 1(il)dong Hanam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kang, Sun Kil Chowon Daelim Apt. 201-803 Pyeongan-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Yang, Won Jae Gochon Greenvilla 202 593-1,Singok-ri Gochon-myeon Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Kim, Honggyu Sinan Poeun Apt. 103-902 Wanggok-dong Uiwan-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Shin, Young Hoon Hyundai Apt. 102-102 Seocho 1(il)dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | 08 /
Kim, Do Youl Sin Banpo Hanshin Apt. 333-202 Jamwon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | 09 /
Lee, Honyun@Sibeomdanji Samsung Hanshin Apt. 102-301 Seohyeon-dong Bundang-gu Seonganam Gyeonggi-do / KR | 10 /
Jung, Myung Jong 101ho, 9-17 Yangjae 1-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | [2018/30] |
Former [2007/30] | 01 /
Sung, Myeon Chang Woorimjutek 302 219-8, Gusan-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Changnam Hyundai Artvilla 303 317-5, Yangjae-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Sangkyoon 470-24, Deokpung 1(il)dong Hanam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Kang, Sun Kil Chowon Daelim Apt. 201-803 Pyeongan-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Yang, Won Jae Gochon Greenvilla 202 593-1,Singok-ri Gochon-myeon Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
06 /
Kim, Honggyu Sinan Poeun Apt. 103-902 Wanggok-dong Uiwan-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
07 /
Shin, Young Hoon Hyundai Apt. 102-102 Seocho 1(il)dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | |||
08 /
Kim, Do Youl Sin Banpo Hanshin Apt. 333-202 Jamwon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | |||
09 /
Lee, Honyun Sibeomdanji Samsung Hanshin Apt. 102-301 Seohyeon-dong Bundang-gu Seonganam Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
10 /
Jung, Myung Jong 101ho, 9-17 Yangjae 1-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2018/30] |
Former [2012/07] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Schwepnitzer Str. 2 01097 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07001187.9 | 19.01.2007 | [2007/30] | Priority number, date | KR20060006010 | 19.01.2006 Original published format: KR 20060006010 | KR20060006537 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: KR 20060006537 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1811569 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1811569 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | [2010/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1811569 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, // H01L51/52 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
H10K59/128 (EP,US);
H10K50/826 (US);
H10K59/123 (EP,US);
H10K59/80523 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/28] | H01L25/04, H01L27/32, H01L51/52 | ||
Former IPC [2007/30] | H01L27/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Organische lichtemittierende Anzeige | [2007/30] | English: | Organic light emitting display | [2007/30] | French: | Affichage électroluminescent organique | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 14.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2007 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | PT | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | IE | 19.01.2019 | LU | 19.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/33] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.01.2007 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 19.01.2019 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6337492 (JONES GARY W [US], et al) [A] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 10 - column 6, line 67 *; | [XA]US2004195572 (KATO KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * figure 14 * * embodiment 7 * [A] 2,3,6-8; | [XAI]US2004227159 (NAKASHIMA HARUE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1,3-11 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0183] * [A] 3,4,6-8 [I] 11; | [A]US2004263425 (ANZAI AYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract ** figure 5 *; | [A]EP1538668 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-4,6-8 * abstract * * figures 4-10 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0143] *; | [I]US2005237279 (CHEN WEN-KUEN [TW], et al) [I] 1-10 * the whole document * | Examination | US2003227254 | US2005123751 | by applicant | US2005237279 |