EP1779777 - A device for in vivo imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/18] | A device and system for in vivo imaging | ||
[2010/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Given Imaging Ltd. 2 Hacarmel Street New Industrial Park 20692 Yoqneam / IL | [2007/21] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Given Imaging Ltd. Industrial Park, Building 7b, 4th floor 20692 Yokneam Ilite / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iddan, Gavriel 44a Einstein Street 34602 Haifa / IL | 02 /
Avni, Dov 7 Succot Street 34525 Haifa / IL | 03 /
Glukhovsky, Arkady 24/5 Hanuriot Street 36790 Nesher / IL | 04 /
Meron, Gavriel 21, Weizman Street 49556 Kfar Ganim Petach Tikva / IL | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07001479.0 | 08.03.2001 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | US20000187883P | 08.03.2000 Original published format: US 187883 P | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1779777 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1779777 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1779777 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B1/05, H04L25/03 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
A61B1/00016 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/041 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/56 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/00032 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/00036 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/0016 (KR,US);
A61B1/0607 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/0676 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/0684 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/2733 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/2736 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/31 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0031 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/073 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/14539 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/03866 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/50 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/51 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/555 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/66 (EP,KR,US);
H04N25/76 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2007/18] | A61B5/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Invivo-Bildgebung | [2010/52] | English: | A device for in vivo imaging | [2010/52] | French: | Dispositif d'imagerie in vivo | [2010/52] |
Former [2007/18] | Vorrichtung und System für in-vivo-Bildgebung | ||
Former [2007/18] | A device and system for in vivo imaging | ||
Former [2007/18] | Dispositif et système d'imagerie in vivo | Examination procedure | 24.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 21.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01912088.0 / EP1263318 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010912088) is 21.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2011 | BE | 08.06.2011 | CY | 08.06.2011 | DK | 08.06.2011 | FI | 08.06.2011 | NL | 08.06.2011 | SE | 08.06.2011 | TR | 08.06.2011 | GR | 09.09.2011 | ES | 19.09.2011 | PT | 10.10.2011 | IE | 08.03.2012 | LU | 08.03.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4278077 (MIZUMOTO MORIHIDE); | [A]US4416283 (SLOCUM CHESTER D [US]) | Examination | US5833603 | by applicant | US5604531 | WO0076391 |