EP1814320 - Imaging apparatus, method and program for its control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Fumikazu c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ohkawa, Jun c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07001542.5 | 24.01.2007 | [2007/31] | Priority number, date | JP20060020795 | 30.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006020795 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1814320 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/238 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
H04N23/75 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/55 (KR);
H04N23/20 (EP,KR);
H04N5/33 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung, Steuerverfahren und Steuerprogramm dafür | [2007/31] | English: | Imaging apparatus, method and program for its control | [2007/31] | French: | Appareil d'imagerie, procédé et programme pour la commande de celui-ci | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/07] | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |