EP1830037 - Steam turbine blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nogami, Shuuhei c/o Hitachi, Ltd., IP Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Isobe, Nobuhiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd., IP Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Toriya, Hajime c/o Hitachi, Ltd., IP Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Bldg. 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/34] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Beetz & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07001619.1 | 25.01.2007 | [2007/36] | Priority number, date | JP20060056069 | 02.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006056069 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1830037 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1830037 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/30, F01D5/16, F01D5/22, F01D5/34, B23P15/02 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
F01D5/3007 (EP,US);
F01D5/147 (EP,US);
F01D5/16 (EP,US);
F01D5/225 (EP,US);
F01D5/3053 (EP,US);
F01D5/34 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | F01D5/30, F01D5/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2013/29] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dampfturbinenschaufel | [2007/36] | English: | Steam turbine blade | [2007/36] | French: | Aube de turbine à vapeur | [2007/36] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 14.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.06.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.01.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005238492 (DAUSACKER PAUL W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-11 * figures 1-3; claim 15 * [Y] 1-4,6; | [X]JPS59226202 (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-11 * abstract *; | [XY]US3014695 (RANKIN ANDREW W, et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-11 * figures 1-4 * [Y] 7; | [Y]WO2005017320 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * figure 4; claims 6,7,8,17 *; | [YA]US4812107 (BARCELLA SANTINO [CH], et al) [Y] 3 * figures 1-7; claim 1 * [A] 1,2,4,6,8-11; | [YA]EP0073021 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 7 * the whole document * [A] 1,8-11; | [A]JPS62604 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,2,4,6 * abstract *; | [A]US4767274 (WALTER JERRY D [US]) [A] 1,4,6 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3741681 (DE WITT S) [A] 1-4,6,8-11 * column 4, line 13 - line 23; figures 7,8 *; | [A]JPS6065204 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1,7 * the whole document * |