EP1816280 - Louvre arrangement for facades [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORSK HYDRO ASA Bygdoy Allé 2 0257 Oslo 2 / NO | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brüderl, Dietmar Rechbergweg 12 88451 Dettingen / DE | 02 /
Ficht, Francis Wielandstrasse 8 89073 Ulm / DE | 03 /
Jiaxian, Xu Moltkestrasse 8/1 89077 Ulm / DE | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Dziewior, Joachim, et al Patentanwälte Dres. Fay Dziewior & Hentrich Postfach 17 67 89007 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Dziewior, Joachim, et al Patentanwälte Dres. Fay Dziewior & Hentrich Postfach 17 67 89007 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 07001802.3 | 27.01.2007 | [2007/32] | Priority number, date | DE20061005235 | 06.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006005235 | [2007/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1816280 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1816280 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E04F10/08, // E06B7/084 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
E04F10/08 (EP);
E06B7/084 (EP);
E04F10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Title | German: | Lamellenanordnung für Fassaden | [2007/32] | English: | Louvre arrangement for facades | [2007/32] | French: | Ensemble de lamelles pour façades | [2007/32] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 22.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   22.02.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2532153 (LUND HANSEN AS) [A] 1-10* page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1130210 (COLT INTERNAT HOLDINGS AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0009] - [0013]; figures 1,2,3 *; | [X]DE20311814U (SCHUECO INT KG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0027]; figure 4 * |