EP1814316 - Method for displaying an identified region together with an image, and imaging apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-Ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-Chome Ohta-Ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kakuta, Yuko c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | 01 /
Kakuta, Yuko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | ||
Former [2007/31] | Sharp, Alan Cooper Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Middlesex, Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07001929.4 | 30.01.2007 | [2007/31] | Priority number, date | JP20060022507 | 31.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006022507 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1814316 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1814316 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
G06T7/20 (EP,US);
H04N23/635 (EP,US);
H04N23/61 (EP,US);
H04N23/611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/05] |
Former [2007/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anzeige eines identifizierten Bereichs gemeinsam mit einem Bild und Abbildungsvorrichtung | [2007/31] | English: | Method for displaying an identified region together with an image, and imaging apparatus | [2007/31] | French: | Procédé d'affichage d'une région identifiée ensemble avec une image et appareil d'imagerie | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 26.11.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.01.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2015 | 30.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/51] | Divisional application(s) | EP12152744.4 / EP2448249 | EP12152747.7 / EP2448250 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5434617 (BIANCHI MICHAEL H [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 52 * * column 9, line 25 - column 11, line 5 *; | [XA]US2003103647 (RUI YONG [US], et al) [X] 1,10-13,17 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0079] * [A] 2-9,14-16; | [XA]US2003128298 (MOON YOUNG-SU [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,10-13,15,17 * paragraph [0028] - paragraphs [0061] , [0 85]; figures 3, 4 * [A] 2,4-9,14,16; | [A]EP1583022 (SMITHS HEIMANN BIOMETRICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-17* paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030] * |