EP1860246 - Building element for heat insulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÖCK BAUTEILE GmbH Vimbucher Strasse 2 76534 Baden-Baden / DE | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritschi, Hubert Dahlienstrasse 27c 76327 Pfinztal / DE | 02 /
Tobishima, Yasufumi c/o Nihon Kaiser Ltd Ebisu Mt Bldg. 3-15-7 Higashi Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0011 / JP | 03 /
Ishii, Noboru Takara Tsusho Co., Ltd. 4-7-10 Nihonbashi-Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0023 / JP | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Blumenröhr, Dietrich, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 07001938.5 | 30.01.2007 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | DE20061011335 | 09.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006011335 | [2007/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1860246 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1860246 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1860246 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/00 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
E04B1/0038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Title | German: | Bauelement zur Wärmedämmung | [2007/48] | English: | Building element for heat insulation | [2007/48] | French: | Elément de construction pour isolation thermique | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.10.2009 | CZ | 14.10.2009 | DK | 14.10.2009 | EE | 14.10.2009 | FI | 14.10.2009 | IE | 14.10.2009 | LT | 14.10.2009 | LV | 14.10.2009 | NL | 14.10.2009 | PL | 14.10.2009 | RO | 14.10.2009 | SE | 14.10.2009 | SI | 14.10.2009 | SK | 14.10.2009 | TR | 14.10.2009 | BG | 14.01.2010 | GR | 15.01.2010 | ES | 25.01.2010 | LU | 30.01.2010 | BE | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | IS | 14.02.2010 | PT | 15.02.2010 | HU | 15.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
NL | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
LU | 30.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | CY | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
LU | 30.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | CZ | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CZ | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IT | 30.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | CZ | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 25.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19652165 (SYSPRO GRUPPE BETONBAUTEILE E [DE]) [Y] 8,11 * figure 2 *; | [XY]WO0047834 (AVI ALPENLAENDISCHE VERED [AT]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10,12-16 * page 4, line 7 - page 8, line 26 * [Y] 8,11; | [A]DE19947912 (FINGERLING KARL HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]EP1564336 (HALFEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |